Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Manish S Shah
Case #: 1:20-cv-05876
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2020
Terminated:Jan 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 4:02 AM CDT
Defendant
FISHACAR, LTD. d/b/a The Autobarn of Countryside
Represented By
Peter C Kim
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Victoria Vanderschaaf
Litchfield Cavo
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Fennewald
Represented By
John Craig Ireland
The Law Firm Of John C. Ireland
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2023 7:00 PM CDT
Friday, October 02, 2020
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Thomas Fennewald; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17501745.(Ireland, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Thomas Fennewald by John Craig Ireland (Ireland, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ireland, John)
Related: [-]