Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30319

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth D Katz
Case #: 3:20-ap-03020
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2020
Terminated:Nov 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
400 Maryland Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20202
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole M Chisholm
74 Partridge Dr
Springfield, MA 01119
Represented By
Gerald Glasser
Kalill, Glasser & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, November 12, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 11/12 8:12 AM
Disposition of Adversary Number 20-3020 Dismissed Complaint. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 11/12 8:13 AM
Adversary Case 20-3020 Closed. (pf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/30 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order
Wednesday, October 27, 2021
22 22 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 10/27 12:59 PM
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal dated 10/27/2021 Re:1 Complaint. GRANTED. THE PRETRIAL HEARING SCHEDULED IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SET FOR NOVEMBER 10, 2021 IS CANCELED. See Order for Full Text. (pf)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 10/27 9:43 AM
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal By Defendant U.S. Department of Education and Nicole M. Chisholm with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Defendant U.S. Department of Education (Dapcic, Nicole)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, September 12, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 09/13 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/12/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Generic Motion
Thursday, September 02, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Thu 09/02 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Defendant U.S. Department of Education (Dapcic, Nicole)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Thu 09/02 1:45 PM
Endorsed Order dated 9/2/2021 Re:17 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant U.S. Department of Education To Extend Pretrial Deadlines and Continue Pretrial Conference [Re:1 Complaint]. GRANTED INASMUCH THE HEARING OF 09/03/21 IS CONTINUED TO 11/10/21 AT 11:00 AM. THE CONTINUED HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. ALL RELATED DEADLINES ARE EXENDED AS REQUESTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Thu 09/02 1:46 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Continued to 11/10/2021 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing Related [+]. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
Friday, August 27, 2021
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 08/27 3:36 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant U.S. Department of Education To Extend Pretrial Deadlines and Continue Pretrial Conference with certificate of service. (Dapcic, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 06/01 9:50 AM
Endorsed Order dated 6/1/2021 Re:15 Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Extend Time for Discovery and to Reschedule Pre-Trial Conference [Re:1 Complaint]. GRANTED; THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING OF 06/25/21 IS CONTINUED TO 09/03/21 AT 11:00 AM. THE CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Tue 06/01 9:51 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued to 9/3/2021 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing Related [+]. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
Friday, May 28, 2021
15 15 motion Extend Time Fri 05/28 1:27 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm to Extend Time for Discovery and to Reschedule Pre-Trial Conference [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Fri 03/12 10:49 AM
Endorsed Order dated 3/12/2021 Re:13 Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm To Extend Time For Discovery and to Reschedule Pre-Trial Conference Related [+]. GRANTED; THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED AS REQUESTED, AND THE PRE-TRIAL HEARING OF 03/19/21 IS CONTINUED TO 06/25/21 AT 11:00 AM. THE CONTINUED HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing Scheduled/Cont/Resched (No Forms Attached) Fri 03/12 10:50 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued to 6/25/2021 at 11:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing Related [+]. (pf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm
Friday, February 26, 2021
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 02/26 3:49 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm To Extend Time For Discovery and to Reschedule Pre-Trial Conference Related [+] with certificate of service. (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference Tue 12/22 2:30 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/12 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Pre-Trial Order
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12/12 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
9 9 order Pre-Trial Order Wed 12/09 12:43 PM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order dated 12/9/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at a Telephonic Hearing. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. See Order for Full Text. IMPORTANT DEADLINES - DO NOT IGNORE. (pf)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 12/09 12:37 PM
Proceeding Memorandum and Order dated 12/9/2020 Re: Status Conference on1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 42(a), MADE APPLICABLE BY FED. R. BANKR. P. 7042, THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS CONSOLIDATED FOR TRIAL WITH ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NUMBERS 20-3012 20-3013 AND 20-3016 (pf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 12/09 12:35 PM
Status Conference Hearing Held Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. (pf)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/23 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/22/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order To Set Hearing
Friday, November 20, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order To Set Hearing Fri 11/20 9:04 AM
Order dated 12/9/2020 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm. A STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS SET FOR DECEMBER 9, 2020 AT 11:30 A.M. SO THAT THE COURT CAN INQUIRE AS TO WHETHER THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD BE CONSOLIDATED WITH ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NUMBERS 20-3012 20-3013 AND 20-3016 THE HEARING WILL BE CONDUCTED TELEPHONICALLY. PARTIES MAY PARTICIPATE BY DIALING 888-363-4734, AND ENTERING ACCESS CODE 496 4809 WHEN PROMPTED. (pf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/09 4:30 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by U.S. Department of Education. (Dapcic, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 10/07 11:46 AM
Summons Service Executed on Nicole M Chisholm 10/2/2020 (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/01 3:45 PM
Summons Issued on United States Department of Education Answer Due 11/9/2020. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (pf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 10/01 3:39 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Nicole M Chisholm (Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/01 3:34 PM
Adversary case 20-03020 Complaint by Nicole M Chisholm against United States Department of Education. Fee Amount $0.00 Receipt Number Exempt. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Glasser, Gerald)
Related: [-]