California Southern District Court
Judge:Janis L Sammartino
Referred: Jill L Burkhardt
Case #: 3:20-cv-01955
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2020
Terminated:Mar 08, 2021
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Imperial, ECU001546
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 1:52 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 Through 100
Defendant
Roy Estrada
Represented By
Anthony Lucas Hall
Simons Hall Johnston PC
contact info
Defendant
Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC
Represented By
Anthony Lucas Hall
Simons Hall Johnston PC
contact info
Defendant
George Mainas
Represented By
Anthony Lucas Hall
Simons Hall Johnston PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorena Suarez Guzman
Represented By
Diego Aviles
Bibiyan Law Group, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 28 2020
ORDER (1) Granting Joint Stipulation Re Filing of First Amended Complaint and (2) Dismissing as Moot Defendants' Motions (ECF Nos. 5, 6, 7, 8). Plaintiff MAY FILE a First Amended Complaint (FAC) on or before 10/29/2020. Defendants may refile their Motions without prejudice on or before 11/19/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/28/2020. (tcf)
GPO Dec 03 2020
ORDER Vacating Hearings and Taking Motions under Submission without Oral Argument (ECF No. 12, 14, 15, 16, 18). The Court VACATES the hearings currently set for December 10, 2020 (ECF No. 12); January 7, 2021 (ECF Nos. 14, 15, 16); and January 14, 2021 (ECF No. 18), and takes the matters under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/3/2020. (tcf)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, February 24, 2023
26 26 appeal USCA Order Fri 02/24 4:21 PM
DISPOSITIVE ORDER of USCA as to Appeal Document Filed and25 . The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1453(c) is DENIED. (smy1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
25 25 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 01/04 3:14 PM
USCA Case Number 23-80001 for the Petition for Permission to Appeal under 28 U.S.C. Section 1453(c) filed by Lorena Suarez Guzman.(smy1)(jrd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attention All Parties and Counsel
Monday, March 08, 2021
24 24 misc Transfer Letter Received Mon 03/08 3:00 PM
Transfer Letter Received from Eastern District of California. Case number in other court is 1:21cv00348 (jpp)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Case Transferred Out - District FORM Mon 03/08 11:08 AM
Case transferred to Eastern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *Eastern District of California*.*501 I Street, Room 4-200**Sacramento, CA 95814-7300*. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/8/2021. (tcf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transfer Order
Friday, February 12, 2021
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/12 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, December 03, 2020
21 21 respm Reply - Other Thu 12/03 5:26 PM
REPLY - Other re19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lorena Suarez Guzman.(Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Evidentiary Objections
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Thu 12/03 2:04 PM
ORDER Vacating Hearings and Taking Motions under Submission without Oral Argument (ECF No.12 ,14 ,15 ,16 ,18 ). The Court VACATES the hearings currently set for December 10, 2020 (ECF No.12 ); January 7, 2021 (ECF Nos.14 ,15 ,16 ); and January 14, 2021 (ECF No.18 ), and takes the matters under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/3/2020. (tcf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/25 5:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Remand Action to State Court filed by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Monday, November 23, 2020
18 18 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 11/23 5:04 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
17 17 notice Notice of Related Case Mon 11/23 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC of case(s) Imperial County Sup. Ct. Case No. ECU001618 .(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, November 19, 2020
16 16 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 11/19 4:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
15 15 motion Change Venue Thu 11/19 3:34 PM
MOTION to Change Venue by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 11/19 2:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Roy Estrada, George Mainas, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Lucas Hall added to party George Mainas(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/04 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA by Roy Estrada, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,,(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Ex 4 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Notice to State Court,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Email Dated October 2, 2020
Monday, November 02, 2020
12 12 motion Remand Mon 11/02 5:35 PM
MOTION to Remand Action to State Court by Lorena Suarez Guzman. (Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 10/30 9:21 AM
Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 29, 2020
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/29 5:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lorena Suarez Guzman.New Summons Requested. (Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Thu 10/29 10:31 AM
ORDER (1) Granting Joint Stipulation Re Filing of First Amended Complaint and (2) Dismissing as Moot Defendants' Motions (ECF Nos.5 ,6 ,7 ,8 ). Plaintiff MAY FILE a First Amended Complaint (FAC) on or before 10/29/2020. Defendants may refile their Motions without prejudice on or before 11/19/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/28/2020. (tcf)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/28 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Joint Stipulation Re: Filing of First Amended Complaint by Lorena Suarez Guzman(Aviles, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 09, 2020
7 7 motion Change Venue Fri 10/09 12:22 PM
MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of California by Roy Estrada, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
6 6 motion Dismiss Party Fri 10/09 12:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Party Roy Estrada for Improper Joinder by Roy Estrada, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
5 5 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/09 12:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Roy Estrada, Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC.(Hall, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities
Thursday, October 08, 2020
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/08 3:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Hall, Anthony) (tcf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
3 3 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 10/06 8:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1955 JLS-JLB.(no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
2 2 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 10/05 2:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1955 JM-JLB.(no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 10/02 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of Imperial County, case number ECU001546. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14616836.), filed by Peri & Sons Farms of California, LLC, Roy Estrada. The new case number is 3:20-cv-1955-BEN-JLB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 21 pgs Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3