Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00455
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2020 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
John Krane (1)
Represented By
Robert G. Walton
contact info
Timothy J. Kucharski
Richardson & Kucharski
contact info
Philip J. Korey
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Crook
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Andrea Isabella
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/03/2020 4:04 AM EDT
Monday, August 10, 2020
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 8/10/20 filed by USA as to John Joseph Krane (1). (D,Ky) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Thursday, August 13, 2020
Arrest of John Joseph Krane (1) on 8/13/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to John Joseph Krane (1). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Timothy J. Kucharski for John Joseph Krane. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/13/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Initial Appearance as to John Joseph Krane (1) held on 8/13/2020. All parties appeared via video/telephone conference. Andrea Isabella and Elizabeth Crook present as counsel for the government. Timothy Kucharski present and appointed as counsel for the defendant. Also present, Pretrial Services Officer Cassandra Stolarik. Defendant consented to participating via video conference, with no objection from defense counsel or government. Defendant requested a preliminary hearing; government moved for detention; government's motion for detention granted on a temporary basis. Preliminary/detention hearing to be conducted via video/telephone conferencing has been set for 8/18/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Instructions for accessing the video hearing will be emailed to all counsel of record. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/ECRO: A. Saliba. Time: 10 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to John Joseph Krane (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/13/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to John Joseph Krane (1). Preliminary/detention hearing to be conducted via video/telephone conferencing has been set for 8/18/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/13/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
6 6 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Philip J. Korey and and Robert G. Walton appearing for John Joseph Krane (1) (Korey, Philip) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth M. Crook appearing for USA. (Crook, Elizabeth) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2020
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/13/2020 in case as to John Joseph Krane (1). (W,CM) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Preliminary Examination/Detention Hearing as to John Joseph Krane (1) held on 8/18/2020. All parties appeared via video/telephone conference. Andrea Isabella and Elizabeth Crook present as counsel for the government. Robert Walton and Phillip Korey present as counsel for the defendant. Also present, Pretrial Services Officer Cassandra Stolarik. Defendant consented to participating via video conference, with no objection from defense counsel or government. The government proffered the report of pretrial services, exhibits 1-6, and presented testimony from Special Agent Gerrod Briggs who was cross examined by counsel for the defendant. The defense proffered information concerning defendant's lack of criminal history, ties to the community and other information concerning defendant. Arguments for and against a finding of probable cause and detention were made by the parties. The court finds that probable cause has been established, and this case is bound over to the grand jury for further proceedings pursuant to any restrictions as set forth in General Order 2020-08. The court overruled the government's motion for detention and set bond at $20,000 unsecured with standard and special conditions of release. Defendant consented on the record to having Attorney Walton sign the bond documents on his behalf. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal until notified by the clerk or judge that the conditions of release have been satisfied. (Court Reporter ECRO: C. Woodford. Time: 1 hour, 30 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to John Joseph Krane (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/18/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
11 11 Receipt for Passport of John Joseph Krane received on 8/20/2020, receipt Number C807. (Y,A) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
13 13 Order on Government's Motion for Detention as to John Joseph Krane (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/20/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
14 14 Appearance Bond Entered as to John Joseph Krane (1) in amount of $ $20,000.00, unsecured. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
15 15 Order Setting Conditions of Release as to John Joseph Krane (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 8/20/2020. (D,JJ) [1:20-mj-09215-WHB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
16 16 Indictment filed by USA as to John Krane (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page