New Jersey District Court
Judge:Freda L Wolfson
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:20-cv-13865
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2020
Re-opened:Jul 09, 2021
Terminated:Jul 09, 2021
Case in other court:Superior Court of NJ, Mercer County, Law Division, MER-L-001578-20
Last checked: Saturday Apr 03, 2021 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
TYLER J. HILL
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
TYLER JAMES HILL
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
EMILY C. DESMEDT
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN 1-5 AND 6-10 DOES
Defendant
TYLER HOUPT
Represented By
TYLER J. HILL
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
TYLER JAMES HILL
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
EMILY C. DESMEDT
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
MIKE MENNO
Represented By
TYLER J. HILL
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
TYLER JAMES HILL
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
EMILY C. DESMEDT
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAUN SIMMONS
Represented By
DRAKE P. BEARDEN, JR.
Costello & Mains
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, August 06, 2021
14 14 misc Stipulation Fri 08/06 2:38 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., TYLER HOUPT, MIKE MENNO. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 07/09 2:36 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen the case and make a new and separate docket entry reading "CIVIL CASE REOPENED"; this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and without costs. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 07/09/2021. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/24 7:55 AM
LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request to extend the administrative termination deadline for an additional 45 days. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/24/2021. (jmh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/24 7:55 AM
Reset Deadlines: Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/8/2021 (jmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
11 11 misc Letter Fri 05/21 1:26 PM
Letter from from Defendant requesting extension of the administrative termination deadline re10 Order 60-Day Administrative Termination. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Tue 03/23 5:09 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/24/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/23/2021. (jmm, )
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 03/23 4:58 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Settlement Conference held on 3/23/2021. (mm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
9 9 order Order on Oral Motion Tue 02/16 10:21 AM
TEXT ORDER: A Settlement Conference via telephone is set for March 23, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Parties with full settlement authority are required to be available for the duration of the conference. The discovery schedule shall be extended if the matter does not settle. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the settlement conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 02/04 1:41 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2021. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/04 3:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Any motion to amend the pleadings or join new parties must be filed by 2/7/2021 and Fact Discovery is to be completed no later than 5/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/4/2020. (jmh)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 11/04 1:42 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/4/2020. (mm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/26 1:54 PM
Defendant Michael Menno's ANSWER to Complaint by MIKE MENNO.(DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/26 1:53 PM
Defendant Tyler Houpt's ANSWER to Complaint by TYLER HOUPT.(DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/26 1:52 PM
Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
4 4 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 10/08 12:12 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint.. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 10/08 4:16 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MIKE MENNO, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., TYLER HOUPT has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/2020. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
3 3 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 10/05 2:15 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/5/2020. (jmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 10/05 9:50 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/05 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MIKE MENNO, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., TYLER HOUPT from Superior Court of NJ, Mercer County, Law Division, case number MER-L-001578-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11450195), filed by MIKE MENNO, AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC., TYLER HOUPT.(DESMEDT, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit Exhibits A and B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/05 11:29 AM
Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr )
Related: [-]