Sanchez et al v. Nintendo of America Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-06929 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Oct 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 03, 2021 1:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Nintendo of America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.S., a minor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luz Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
A.D., a minor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dolly Vierra
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
78 | 78
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/22 5:10 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
77 | 77
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 11/22 5:08 PM
ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
76 | 76
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 11/22 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lisa Tamiko Omoto (Omoto, Lisa) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 11/22 2:43 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . The docket shows that attorney Lisa Tamiko Omoto is with the law firm of Van De Poel, Levy, Allen, Arneal & Serot, LLP. Attorney is reminded to update the ECF account if there's a change of firm name or address. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:76 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Dolly Vierra, Luz Sanchez, M.S., a minor, A.D., a minor. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 11/16 1:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2022 re 69 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Dolly Vierra, Luz Sanchez, M.S., a minor, A.D., a minor. Parties proffered argument. Court takes motion under submission. Total Time in Court: 7 Minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Aubry Wand. Defendant Attorney: Eric Weiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2022) |