Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-20200
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 07, 2020 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar (1)
Represented By
John William Wylie, IV
John W. Wylie, P.A.
contact info
Louis Casuso
Louis Casuso
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Marcet
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/07/2020 3:46 AM EDT
Friday, July 03, 2020
Arrest of Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar (mdc) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 04, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar (1), Juan Pablo Sandoval Polanco (2). (mdc) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2020
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Initial Appearance as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar held on 7/6/2020. Attorney added: John William Wylie, IV for Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 7/6/20. Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination / Arraignment set for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 16:01:03 / 16:50:47 / 17:22:05) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/6/2020. (mdc) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
5 5 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis: Status Conference in re: Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar held on 7/10/2020. Bond Stipulated to in the amount of $250,000 CSB/NEBBIA(No Hrg., Held). ( Arraignment set for 7/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate., Preliminary Examination set for 7/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.). Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 13:57:25) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/10/2020. (nf) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar: Arraignment set for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (dgj) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar: Arraignment set for 7/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 7/24/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (dgj) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Arraignment set for 7/24/2020 12:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. Preliminary Examination set for 7/24/2020 12:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (dgj) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar: Arraignment set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (dgj) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar: Arraignment set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate. (nf) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Preliminary Hearing as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar held on 7/24/2020, HSI AGENT KATHERINE DIAZ SWORN AND TESTIFIED. Court finds Probable Cause.( Arraignment set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate.) (Court enters SDO as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar held on 7/24/2020. ( Arraignment set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis.) Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital JB-01-7-24-20-VIA ZOOM) STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER: It is Ordered that within 14 days of the date of this order that all parties to this action shall review and comply with Southern District of Florida Local Rules 88.10 (Criminal Discovery), and 88.9(c) (Motions in Criminal Cases). Upon a sufficient showing, the Court may at any time, upon a properly filed motion, order that the discovery or inspection provided for by this Standing Order be denied, restricted or deferred, or make such other order as is appropriate. It is expected by the Court, however, that counsel for both sides shall make a good faith effort to comply with the letter and spirit of this Standing Order. It shall be the continuing duty of counsel for both sides to immediately reveal to opposing counsel all newly discovered information or other material within the scope of Local Rule 88.10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 7/24/2020. (nf) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL] (Entered: 07/27/2020)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2020
8 8 First RESPONSE to Standing Discovery Order by USA as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar, Juan Pablo Sandoval Polanco (Marcet, Daniel) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 18, 2020
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Louis Casuso appearing for USA. . Attorney Louis Casuso added to party Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar(pty:dft). (Casuso, Louis) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
10 10 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Louis Casuso for John Wylie IV by Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar. Responses due by 10/2/2020 (Casuso, Louis) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
11 11 RESPONSE to Motion by Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar re10 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Louis Casuso for John Wylie IV Replies due by 9/25/2020. (Casuso, Louis) [1:20-mj-03087-LFL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
12 12 INFORMATION as to Juan Jose Aguirre Folgar (1) count 1 AND FORFEITURE COUNT. (cg1)
Related: [-]