Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:20-cv-00965
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2020
Terminated:Jun 08, 2021
Last checked: Monday Apr 05, 2021 5:55 AM EDT
defendant
Ambitious Marketing Group
defendant
Kamisha Marie Daniel
defendant
Elite Integrity LLC
defendant
First Network, LLC
defendant
Myeshia S. Gibson
defendant
Martinee Lashunn Jackson
defendant
Optimum Resource Group
Represented By
Nadeem Noah Harfouch
The Harfouch Law Firm PLLC
contact info
plaintiff
Thomas Williams
Represented By
Phillip C. Rogers
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Rostam Varahrami
Terminated: 02/04/2021


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
28 28 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 10/06 5:02 PM
ORDER granting27 motion for attorney fees; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (jep)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
27 27 motion Attorney Fees Tue 06/22 2:13 PM
MOTION for attorney fees and costs by plaintiff Thomas Williams; (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
26 26 order Judgment - Default Tue 06/08 2:38 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff against defendants First Network, LLC, Elite Integrity LLC, Ambitious Marketing Group, Kamisha Marie Daniel, Martinee Lashunn Jackson, and Myeshia S. Gibson; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Application for Entry of Default Judgment Tue 06/08 2:36 PM
ORDER granting24 application for entry of default judgment; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
24 24 motion Application for Entry of Default Judgment Fri 06/04 1:50 PM
APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to First Network, LLC, Elite Integrity LLC, Ambitious Marketing Group, Kamisha Marie Daniel, Martinee Lashunn Jackson and Myeshia S. Gibson (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
23 23 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Fri 05/21 11:28 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiff shall submit documents necessary to obtain a default judgment against defendants Ambitious Marketing Group, Martinee Lashunn Jackson, Kamisha Marie Daniel, Elite Integrity LLC, First Network, LLC, and Myeshia S. Gibson or show cause by 6/4/2021; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
22 22 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party Thu 05/13 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Optimum Resource Group and Rostam Varahrami filed by plaintiff Thomas Williams (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
21 21 order Notice Cancelling Hearing Tue 04/20 3:53 PM
NOTICE cancelling rule 16 scheduling set for 4/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Tue 04/20 3:29 PM
ORDER requiring dismissal papers as to plaintiff and defendant Optimum Resource Group to be submitted by 5/13/2021; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 19, 2021
19 19 notice Settlement Mon 04/19 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Partial Settlement, between Plaintiff and Defendant Optimum Resource Group (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
18 18 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Mon 04/05 6:23 AM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/28/2021 at 02:00 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 4/23/2021; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Party Thu 02/04 11:50 AM
ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL dismissing without prejudice Defendant Rostam Varahrami; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
16 16 order Default (Entry of) Thu 01/21 10:25 AM
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Kamisha Marie Daniel, Elite Integrity LLC, First Network, LLC, and Myeshia S. Gibson (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/20 5:16 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Optimum Resource Group (Harfouch, Nadeem)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Application for Entry of Default Wed 01/20 1:57 PM
APPLICATION for entry of default as to Kamisha Marie Daniel; Elite Integrity LLC; First Network, LLC; Myeshia S. Gibson; and Optimum Resource Group (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 01/20 5:13 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nadeem Noah Harfouch on behalf of defendant Optimum Resource Group (Harfouch, Nadeem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/05 4:03 PM
ORDER re Plaintiff's Petition Re: Service of Process12 ; Plaintiff shall have an additional twenty-eight (28) days to complete service of process on Defendant Rostam Varahrami; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
12 12 notice Petition in Response to Court Notice Mon 01/04 4:48 PM
PETITION SERVICE OF PROCESS in response to court notice; (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 12/31 10:11 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall, not later than 1/21/2021, move for an entry of default against Defendants Kamisha Daniel, Elite Integrity LLC, First Network, LLC, Myeshia Gibson, and Optimum Resource Group, or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case against Defendants Kamisha Daniel, Elite Integrity LLC, First Network, LLC, Myeshia Gibson, and Optimum Resource Group for lack of prosecution pursuant to W.D. Mich. LCivR 41.1; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
10 10 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Thu 12/10 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as to Rostam Varahrami; complete service of process within 90 days after the filing of the complaint or the case will be dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Rostam Varahrami; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/09 11:47 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Kamisha Marie Daniel served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Elite Integrity LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; First Network, LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Myeshia S. Gibson served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Optimum Resource Group served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
8 8 order Default (Entry of) Tue 11/24 3:23 PM
DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Ambitious Marketing Group, Martinee Lashunn Jackson (ns)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Entry of Default Tue 11/24 2:24 PM
APPLICATION for entry of default as to Ambitious Marketing Group and Martinee Lashunn Jackson (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers
6 6 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Tue 11/24 2:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to move for entry of default or show cause by 12/8/2020; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 31, 2020
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 10/31 9:28 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Ambitious Marketing Group served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; Martinee Lashunn Jackson served on 10/19/2020, answer due 11/9/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/08 1:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Ambitious Marketing Group, Kamisha Marie Daniel, Elite Integrity LLC, First Network, LLC, Myeshia S. Gibson, Martinee Lashunn Jackson, Optimum Resource Group, Rostam Varahrami (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Thu 10/08 1:06 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (jem)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Wed 10/07 10:19 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/07 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas Williams (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Wed 10/07 10:22 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Thomas Williams in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5776837 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]