California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Charles Novack
Case #: 4:20-bk-41621
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Nov 03, 2020
Terminated:Apr 25, 2023

Debtor
Terrill Transportation, Inc.
TTI c/o Kevin Terrill, P.O. Box 1285
Lodi, CA 95241
Represented By
K Keith McAllister
Law Offices Of K. Keith Mcallister
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marlene G. Weinstein
1511 Sycamore Ave. #M-259
Hercules, CA 94547
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 10/08/2020 12:00 AM PDT
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
crditcrd none Wed 10/07 3:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 20-41621 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 30823204, amount $ 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 10/07 4:00 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/03/2020 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (admin, )
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 10/07 3:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Terrill Transportation, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 10/21/2020. (McAllister, K)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 10/07 3:16 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 47800 Filed by Debtor Terrill Transportation, Inc. (McAllister, K)
Related: [-]