New York Northern District Court
Case #: 5:20-cr-00273
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2020
Last checked: Thursday Oct 08, 2020 3:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Lamb (1)
Represented By
George F. Hildebrandt
Office Of George F. Hildebrandt
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tamara Thomson
Office Of United States Attorney - Syracuse Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/08/2020 3:52 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby: Waiver of Indictment and Plea Hearing held on 10/7/2020 as to Matthew Lamb. Defendant is sworn and questioned by the Court. The Defendant is advised of his constitutional rights and consequences of waiving Indictment. The Waiver of Indictment is signed by Defendant, Defendant's counsel, and Chief Judge Suddaby, which is accepted by the Court for filing in Case No. 5:20-CR-273 (GTS). Defendant is advised of his constitutional rights and the consequences of pleading guilty. The Government amends on the record the defendant's e-mail address listed in Count 2 of the Information as it should be Bgxxxxxx@google.com instead and in place of Bgxxxxxx@yahoo.com. Defendant is arraigned and pleads guilty to Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. The Government states a factual basis for the plea. Maximum possible penalties are stated for the record. The Court accepts the Defendant's plea of Guilty to Counts 1 and 2 of the Information. Plea agreement is incorporated into the record. The Court orders a Pre-Sentence Investigation Report from Probation. Sentencing is scheduled for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse, New York. Defendant's counsel requests that the defendant receive credit for time in prison as to these new charges, since he is currently in custody on the violation of supervised release in 5:11-CR-571 (GTS). Chief Judge Suddaby agrees that the defendant should be credited for his time in prison on these new charges. Defendant is ordered detained pending sentencing on these new charges in this case and remanded to USMS. APP: Tamara Thomson, AUSA, George Hildebrandt, Esq., and USPO: Paul Brandofino. Time: 10:15 AM - 10:49 AM. (Court Reporter Jodi Hibbard) (sal)
Related: [-]
1 1 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Matthew Lamb. (sal )
Related: [-]
2 2 INFORMATION as to Matthew Lamb (1) Counts 1-2. (sal )
Related: [-]
4 4 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Matthew Lamb (sal )
Related: [-]
5 5 GUIDELINE ORDER as to Matthew Lamb. Sentencing set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. Sentencing Memo Deadline is 1/20/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/10/2021. (sal)
Related: [-]