Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael W Mosman
Case #: 3:20-cv-01736
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2020
Terminated:Dec 15, 2020
Last checked: Monday Apr 05, 2021 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Sequoia Price-Lazarus
Defendant
ETZ Haim Holdings S.P.C
Plaintiff
Andrew D'Addario
Represented By
S. Caitlin Dolan
Dolan Law Group PC
contact info
Martin C. Dolan
Dolan Law Group PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Erich Eisenhart
Represented By
S. Caitlin Dolan
Dolan Law Group PC
contact info
Martin C. Dolan
Dolan Law Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
7 7 order Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case Tue 12/15 1:32 PM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (dls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 10/21 11:20 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to ETZ Haim Holdings S.P.C. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 10/21 11:19 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Sequoia Price-Lazarus. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
4 4 service Proposed Summons Mon 10/19 10:14 AM
Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dolan, Martin)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Mon 10/19 10:08 AM
Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dolan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 10/09 3:49 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 2/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 3/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (rs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/07 5:49 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7331345 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Erich Eisenhart, Andrew D'Addario against ETZ HAIM HOLDING S.P.C abn LAZARAS NATURALS (previously ETZ Hayim Holding, Inc. and ETZ Holding, LLC), Sequoia Price-Lazarus. (Dolan, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet