Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:20-cv-03552
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 06, 2021 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Represented By
Rebekah E Blake
Jones Day
contact info
Theodore M Grossman
Jones Day
contact info
Steven N Geise
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Honeywell International Inc
Represented By
Kirby D Shealy, III
Adams And Reese
contact info
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Represented By
John R Wellschlager
Dla Piper Llp Us Md
contact info
Delia G Frazier
Dla Piper Llp Us - Atlanta
contact info
Defendant
3M Company, The
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Margaret Raymond-Flood
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Martha N Donovan
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Represented By
Margaret Raymond-Flood
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Martha N Donovan
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Plaintiff
James Stickells
Represented By
Robin M Primeau
Murray Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilda Stickells
Represented By
Robin M Primeau
Murray Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Johnson Controls International PLC
Terminated: 12/29/2020
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Terminated: 12/29/2020
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 12/29/2020
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
Terminated: 12/29/2020


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Other Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/29 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs at to Certain Named Defendants Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Primeau, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/11 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
9 9 misc Status Report Thu 11/12 3:35 PM
STATUS REPORT General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Daikin America Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03552-RMG(Grossman, Theodore)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/12 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M Grossman on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03394-RMG, 2:20-cv-03552-RMG(Grossman, Theodore)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/12 3:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N Geise on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03394-RMG, 2:20-cv-03552-RMG(Geise, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/12 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah E Blake on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03394-RMG, 2:20-cv-03552-RMG(Blake, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
5 5 misc Status Report Tue 11/10 6:30 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corp. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
4 4 misc Status Report Mon 10/26 5:11 PM
STATUS REPORT Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Honeywell International Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03394-RMG, 2:20-cv-03552-RMG(Shealy, Kirby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 10/08 5:21 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Stickells et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-3552-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Louisiana (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/08 5:20 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/08 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9396275.), filed by James Stickells, Wilda Stickells. Service due by 1/6/2021(sshe, )
Related: [-]