Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34054

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:20-ap-03128
Nature of Suit71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patrick Hagaman Daugherty
Represented By
Patrick Hagaman Daugherty
contact info
Plaintiff
Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By
Zachery Z. Annable
Hayward & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of service Wed 02/03 7:45 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Complaint Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Monday, February 01, 2021
court Close adversary case Mon 02/01 11:01 AM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-3128 closed (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Fri 01/29 5:08 PM
Notice of dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of service Mon 12/28 8:30 PM
Certificate of service re: Order Approving Stipulation Resolving Adversary Proceeding Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 8 Order approving stipulation resolving adversary proceeding (RE: related document(s)7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Entered on 12/23/2020 (Okafor, M.)
Friday, December 25, 2020
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Fri 12/25 11:33 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order approving stipulation resolving adversary proceeding (RE: related document(s)7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Entered on 12/23/2020 (Okafor, M.)
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of service Wed 12/23 11:49 PM
Certificate of service re: Stipulation Resolving Adversary Proceeding Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Patrick Hagaman Daugherty. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint). filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
8 8 7 pgs order Order (generic) Wed 12/23 12:57 PM
Order approving stipulation resolving adversary proceeding Related [+]. Entered on 12/23/2020 (Okafor, M.)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Friday, December 18, 2020
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 12/18 10:38 AM
Stipulation by Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Patrick Hagaman Daugherty. filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 12, 2020
6 6 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 11/12 4:03 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Patrick Hagaman Daugherty (Kathman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of service Thu 10/15 2:34 PM
Certificate of service re: (1) Complaint to Extend the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, (2) Summons in an Adversary Proceeding, and (3) Order Regarding Adversary Proceedings Trial Setting and Alternative Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons issued,3 Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Thu 10/15 2:24 PM
Summons service executed on Patrick Hagaman Daugherty 10/14/2020 (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Tue 10/13 7:30 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 3/8/2021 at 01:30 PM at Dallas Judge Jernigan Ctrm. Trial will be held during the week of 3/15/2021. Entered on 10/13/2020 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
2 2 court Summons issued Tue 10/13 7:28 AM
Summons issued on Patrick Hagaman Daugherty Answer Due 11/12/2020 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 08, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/08 5:01 PM
Adversary case 20-03128 Complaint by Highland Capital Management, L.P. against Patrick Hagaman Daugherty. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay). (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet