Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:20-cr-01864
Case Filed:Oct 07, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 10, 2020 12:42 AM MST
Defendant
Oscar Alberto Martinez (3)
Represented By
Steven Donald West
Steven D West PC
contact info
Defendant
Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2)
Represented By
Bradley King Roach
Roach Law Firm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1)
Represented By
Mark Robert Resnick
Resnick Law Group PLLC
contact info
Michael John Martinez Areinoff
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Philip Kimble
Law Office Of Philip Kimble
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Fernando Perea (4)
Represented By
Brenda Leticia Dabdoub
Law Office Of Brenda Dabdoub
contact info
Defendant
Joel Rafael Ruelas (5)
Represented By
Frederick Michael Carrillo
Carrillo Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alejandra Valenzuela (6)
Represented By
Barbara Tapper Catrillo
Catrillo Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert A Fellrath
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/10/2020 2:14 AM MST
Thursday, February 20, 2020
Arrest of Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea and Alejandra Valenzuela on 2/20/2020. (SSG) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Jose Rafael Ruelas and Alejandra Valenzuela. (SSG) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to attorney Michael J.M. Areinoff by Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. (Areinoff, Michael) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa held on 2/21/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN AND DEFENDANT SWORN. Adding Robert A Fellrath for USA, appointing Michael Areinoff for defendant with Appointment Type: FPD. Defendant states true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, AFPD Michael Areinoff for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Related [+] Hearing held 2:41 pm to 3:44 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance as to Carlos Fernando Perea held on 2/21/2020. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Defendant states true name to be the same. Brenda Dabdoub specially appears for defendant. The Court orders counsel to file a notice of appearance by 5:00 p.m. today. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing waived on 2/21/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Defense counsel makes an oral record regarding defendant's pretrial services report. Counsel requests the defendant be screened for residential treatment. The Court grants the request and resets the detention hearing for 3/6/20. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, Attorney Brenda Dabdoub, specially appears, for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Related [+] Hearing held 2:41 pm to 3:44 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance as to Oscar Alberto Martinez held on 2/21/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN AND DEFENDANT SWORN. Appointing Steven Donald West for defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant states true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defense counsel requests Pretrial Services screen the defendant for residential treatment. The Court grants the request and resets the detention hearing for 3/6/20. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing as to Oscar Alberto Martinez waived on 2/21/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Steven West for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Related [+] Hearing held 2:41 pm to 3:44 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing as to Alejandra Valenzuela held on 2/21/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN AND DEFENDANT SWORN. Appointing Barbara Tapper Catrillo for defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Defendant states true name to be the same. The Court orders the defendant released on their own recognizance to a third party custodian. Defendant and third party custodian are advised on the record. Preliminary Hearing waived on 2/21/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Magistrate Case Referral is Judge Kimmins, all filings shall reflect 20-5809M-(LCK). Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Barbara Catrillo for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 2:41 pm to 3:44 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
8 8 Amended by Doc. 32, ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Alejandra Valenzuela. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/21/20.(CKS) Modified on 3/4/2020 (CKS). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2020
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brenda Leticia Dabdoub appearing for Carlos Fernando Perea . (Dabdoub, Brenda) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. (MFR) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Oscar Alberto Martinez. (MFR) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alejandra Valenzuela. (MFR) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER granting2 Motion to Withdraw Attorney as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1). IT IS ORDERED FPD Attorney Michael Areinoff is relieved of any further responsibilities in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED CJA attorney, Philip Kimble, is appointed as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/24/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2020
17 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Detention Hearing as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa continued on 2/25/2020. Pretrial Services recommends detention as the report remains unverified. At the request of defense counsel and there being no objection from the Government, The Court resets the Detention Hearing for 2/27/20 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ferraro. Preliminary Hearing is waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Magistrate case referral is Judge Kimmins. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Philip Kimble for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter:N/A. Detention Hearing set for 2/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Related [+] Hearing held 10:30 AM to 10:37 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Thursday, February 27, 2020
22 22 MOTION to Quash Arrest Warrant by USA as to Jose Rafael Ruelas.(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 *AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela. (MCO) *Modified reflect correct Defendant's name, for defendant Joel Rafael Ruelas; NEF regenerated on 2/28/2020 (MFR)/(SCH). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
26 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Detention Hearing as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa held on 2/27/2020. Pretrial Services recommends detention and the Government concurs. Defense counsel argues for release. The Court orders the defendant detained pending trial. Appearances : AUSA Monte Clausen, attorney on duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Philip Kimble for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter: N/A. Related [+] Hearing held 10:32 AM to 11:19 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Friday, February 28, 2020
25 25 ORDER granting22 Motion to Quash the Arrest Warrant as to Joel Rafael Ruelas (5). It is Ordered that the arrest warrant for defendant named, JOSE Rafael Ruelas, in this case is QUASHED. The Court has received the information provided by the Government in this motion, that Defendant that was named JOSE Rafael Ruelas, has a TRUE NAME of JOEL Rafael Ruelas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/27/2020.(MFR) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 2/27/20.(CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
28 28 IT IS ORDERED, as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Alejandra Valenzuela (6), Initial Appearance on AMENDED Complaint is set for 3/4/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Defendants are ordered to appear for this hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins.(LCK, nb)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
29 29 IT IS ORDERED, as to Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Initial Appearance on AMENDED Complaint is set for 3/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins.(LCK, nb)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
30 30 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Government avows the only change to the amended complaint is the name of defendant number five. Initial Appearance as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa held on 3/4/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PREVIOUSLY TAKEN AND DEFENDANT SWORN. Defendant states true name to be the same. Defense counsel informs the Court that Mr. Resnick intends to file a notice of substitution in this matter. He requests that the detention/preliminary hearing be set next week after the substitution has been filed. The government objects to the defendant being set for another detention hearing. Over the objection of the government, the Court sets a detention/preliminary hearing for 3/11/20, based on the fact that the amended complaint is a new charging document. Defendant is temporarily detained pending his detention/preliminary hearing. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Philip Kimble for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Related [+] Hearing held 3:06 pm to 3:21 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
31 31 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Government avows the only change to the amended complaint is the name of defendant number five. Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing as to Alejandra Valenzuela held on 3/4/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PREVIOUSLY TAKEN AND DEFENDANT SWORN. Defendant states true name to be the same. The Court orders the defendant released on her own recognizance and she is advised on the record. Preliminary Hearing waived on 3/4/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Magistrate Case Referral is Judge Kimmins, all filings shall reflect 20-5809M-(LCK). Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Barbara Catrillo for defendant. Defendant is present and released. Related [+] Hearing held 3:06 pm to 3:21 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
32 32 AMENDED ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Alejandra Valenzuela. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/4/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2020
40 40 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/5/2020 as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa. (CXE) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
37 37 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Initial Appearance on Amended Complaint as to Oscar Alberto Martinez held on 3/6/2020. Defendant state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to Oscar Alberto Martinez held on 3/6/2020. Pretrial Services recommends release to residential treatment facility when bed space becomes available on 3/25/2020. The Government objects and argues for detention. Defense counsel argues for release to residential treatment facility as recommended by Pretrial Services. The Court orders the defendant detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing is waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Magistrate case referral is Judge Kimmins. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Steven West for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter: N/A. Related [+] Hearing held 10:34 AM to 11:18 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
39 39 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Initial Appearance on Amended Complaint as to Carlos Fernando Perea held on 3/6/2020. Defendant states true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to Carlos Fernando Perea held on 3/6/2020. Pretrial Services recommends release to residential treatment facility when bed space becomes available. The Government does not oppose the recommendation of Pretrial Services; however, requests in that an additional condition of a cash bond be imposed to secured the defendant's appearance. Defense counsel argues for release to the residential treatment facility as recommended by Pretrial Services and requests that in the alternative to the cash bond, the defendant be released to a third-party custodian. For reasons set forth on the record, the Court denies the request for an additional condition of a cash bond and orders the defendant released on own recognizance to Community Bridges when bed space becomes available on 3/9/2020. Preliminary Hearing is waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Defense counsel makes a record regarding the allegations contained in the Complaint. The Magistrate case referral is Judge Kimmins. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, CJA Attorney Brenda Dabdoub for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter: N/A.. Related [+] Hearing held 10:34 AM to 11:18 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
41 41 *AMENDED BY DOC. 60 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S. Aguilera: Initial Appearance as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa held on 3/6/2020. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN as Defendant states he has retained counsel. Defendant states his true name to be the same. Pretrial Services recommends detention. Government invokes presumption. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant is temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances : AUSA, Fredrick Cocio, attorney on duty for the Government; Special Appearance attorney, Bradley Roach for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Bruce G. Macdonald. Related [+] Hearing held 2:44 PM to 3:20 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) *Modified on 3/23/2020 (CXE). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
60 60 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Amending Doc. 41 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S. Aguilera: Initial Appearance on Amended Complaint as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa held on 3/6/2020. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN as Defendant states he has retained counsel. Defendant states his true name to be the same. Pretrial Services recommends detention. Government invokes presumption. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant is temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances : AUSA, Fredrick Cocio, attorney on duty for the Government; Special Appearance attorney, Bradley Roach for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Interpreter N/A. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Bruce G. Macdonald. Related [+] Hearing held 2:44 PM to 3:20 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) Reason for Amendment: Add Defendant made an appearance on Amended Complaint. [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Monday, March 09, 2020
38 38 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Oscar Alberto Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 3/6/2020.(CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
42 42 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley King Roach appearing for Hector Martinez-Ochoa . (Roach, Bradley) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
43 43 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Carlos Fernando Perea. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera on 3/6/2020.(CMB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
44 44 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Carlos Fernando Perea. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-SA, ) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
45 45 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Robert Resnick appearing for Osmar Martinez-Ochoa . Related [+] [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] snick, Mark
46 46 *First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Mark R. Resnick by Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. Related [+] *Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 3/11/2020 (MCO). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] snick, Mark
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
47 47 *MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: The Court grants46 defense counsel's Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. IT IS ORDERED CJA Attorney Philip Kimble is relieved of any further responsibilities in this matter. Defendant has retained attorney Mark Resnick as counsel of record to represent him. Detention Hearing held on 3/11/2020. Defense counsel argues for release of defendant. Government argues for detention of defendant. The Court orders the defendant detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing waived on 3/11/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Appearances : AUSA Robert Fellrath for the Government, retained attorney Mark Resnick for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 11:34 am to 11:46 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS) *Modified to add defendant name on 3/11/2020 (CKS); NEF regenerated on 3/12/2020 (CEI). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
48 48 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/11/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2020
49 49 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Detention Hearing as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa held on 3/12/2020. Pretrial Services recommends detention and the Government concurs. Defense counsel argues for release. The Court grants the Government's oral motion for detention. Defendant ordered detained pending. Preliminary Hearing as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa waived on 3/12/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. The Magistrate referral is Judge Kimmins. Appearances : AUSA Robert A Fellrath for the Government, retained attorney Bradley Roach for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 10:31 AM to 11:12 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
50 50 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/12/2020.(SIB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 14, 2020
51 51 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/14/2020 as to Joel Rafael Ruelas. (CXE) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
52 52 *AMENDED BY DOC. 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S. Aguilera: Initial Appearance as to Joel Rafael Ruelas held on 3/16/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing CJA Attorney, Frederick Michael Carrillo to represent Defendant. Defendant states his true name to be the same. Pretrial Services recommends release and the Government invokes presumption. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant is temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required Defendant. Appearances : AUSA, Jacob Operskalski, attorney on duty for the Government; CJA Attorney, F. Michael Carrillo for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Juan Carlos Cordova assists the Defendant. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S. Aguilera. Related [+] Hearing held 3:35 PM to 5:17 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) *Modified on 3/23/2020 (CXE). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
61 61 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Amending Doc. 52 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S. Aguilera: Initial Appearance on Amended Complaint as to Joel Rafael Ruelas held on 3/16/2020. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing CJA Attorney, Frederick Michael Carrillo to represent Defendant. Defendant states his true name to be the same. Pretrial Services recommends release and the Government invokes presumption. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant is temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required Defendant. Appearances : AUSA, Jacob Operskalski, attorney on duty for the Government; CJA Attorney, F. Michael Carrillo for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Juan Carlos Cordova assists the Defendant. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S. Aguilera. Related [+] Hearing held 3:35 PM to 5:17 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) Reason for Amendment: Add Defendant made an appearance on Amended Complaint. [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
53 53 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joel Rafael Ruelas. (KAH) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
54 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela. (Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
55 55 AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela. (Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
56 56 ORDER granting55 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Joel Rafael Ruelas (5), Alejandra Valenzuela (6). Excludable delay under 18, United States Code, Section 3161 (h)(7)(A) is found to commence on 3/16/20 and to end on 4/24/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/18/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
57 57 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Preliminary Hearing as to Joel Rafael Ruelas waived on 3/19/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Detention Hearing as to Joel Rafael Ruelas held on 3/19/2020. Pretrial Services recommends release. Without objection, the Court releases defendant to a third party custodian. Parties are advised on the record. Appearances : AUSA Julie Sottosanti, attorney on duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Frederick Michael Carrillo for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Lucinda Bush assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 10:18 AM to 11:14 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
58 58 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Joel Rafael Ruelas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/19/2020.(SIB) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2020
62 62 MINUTE ORDER as to Joel Rafael Ruelas: In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, in lieu of the defendants appearance at the currently scheduled preliminary hearing and detention hearing, counsel may file a waiver of the preliminary hearing and a consent to the defendants detention based on their clients lack of ties to the United States, with leave to reopen the detention hearing at a later date, if appropriate. If defense counsel is requesting a preliminary hearing with testimony from a government witness, then defense counsel must contact the assigned magistrate judge to schedule the preliminary hearing sufficiently in advance of the 14 day deadline provided by Rule 5.1(c). If counsel would like to schedule a change of plea hearing, they should contact the referred Magistrate Judges chambers. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
63 63 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Joel Rafael Ruelas. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-KL, ) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2020
64 64 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela. (Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
65 65 AMENDED Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela.(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 27, 2020
66 66 ORDER granting65 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Joel Rafael Ruelas (5), Alejandra Valenzuela (6). The time period between 3/16/20 and 6/1/20 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 4/27/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
67 67 *First MOTION to Revoke or Amend Pretrial Detention Order by Hector Martinez-Ochoa.(Roach, Bradley) *Modified on 4/28/2020, to correct motion type. (MCO). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Medical Document
Wednesday, April 29, 2020
68 68 MINUTE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the Government is to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Revoke or Amend Pretrial Detention Order (Doc. 67) as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), by Friday, May 8, 2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LCK, nb) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
70 70 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa re:67 MOTION to Review Detention Order . (Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2020
71 71 ORDER denying67 Motion to Review Detention Order as to Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2). The Court reaffirms its finding that Defendant presents a risk of nonappearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 5/1/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
72 72 *MOTION for Reconsideration by Oscar Alberto Martinez. (West, Steven) *Modified on 5/13/2020, to correct motion type. (MCO). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
73 73 MINUTE ORDER: Government shall file a response to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 72), as to Oscar Alberto Martinez, by 5/26/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LCK, nb) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
74 74 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Oscar Alberto Martinez re:72 MOTION to Review Detention Order .(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit DEA Report
Thursday, May 21, 2020
75 75 ORDER denying72 Motion to Review Detention Order as to Oscar Alberto Martinez (3). Please see attached pdf for complete information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 5/21/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
76 76 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela.(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
77 77 ORDER granting76 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Joel Rafael Ruelas (5), Alejandra Valenzuela (6). The time period between 3/16/20 and 6/16/20 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 6/2/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2020
78 78 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela.(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 29, 2020
79 79 ORDER granting78 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Joel Rafael Ruelas (5), Alejandra Valenzuela (6). The time period between 3/16/20 and 7/29/20 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 6/29/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
80 80 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela.(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, July 30, 2020
81 81 ORDER granting80 Fifth Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Joel Rafael Ruelas (5), Alejandra Valenzuela (6). The time period between 3/16/20 and 10/12/20 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/30/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
82 82 *First MOTION to Revoke or Amend Pretrial Detention Order by Osmar Martinez-Ochoa. Related [+] *Modified to correct motion type on 9/24/2020 (MFR). [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] snick, Mark
Thursday, September 24, 2020
83 83 MINUTE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the Government shall file their response to Defendant's Motion to Modify Conditions of Release (Doc. 82) by 10/7/2020. Pretrial Services shall provide this Court with an updated report and recommendation, in reference to the motion as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa by 10/7/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LCK, nb) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
84 84 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa re:82 MOTION to Revoke .(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Conviction Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
86 86 First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Hector Martinez-Ochoa. (Roach, Bradley) [4:20-mj-05809-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
87 87 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 17, Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 16, Oscar Alberto Martinez (3) count(s) 1, Carlos Fernando Perea (4) count(s) 1, 14, 15, Joel Rafael Ruelas (5) count(s) 1, 7, 8, 9, 10, Alejandra Valenzuela (6) count(s) 1, 11, 12, 13. Counsel is advised as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa (1), Hector Martinez-Ochoa (2), and Oscar Alberto Martinez (3), Arraignment set for 10/30/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Eric J. Markovich in Courtroom 3C. Trial date is 12/8/2020 at 9:30 AM, Plea Deadline set 11/20/2020. Counsel is advised as to Carlos Fernando Perea (4), Joel Rafael Ruelas (5), and Alejandra Valenzuela (6), Arraignment set for 10/28/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 5C. Trial date is 12/8/2020 at 9:30 AM, Plea Deadline set 11/20/2020. NOTE: The process for waiving defendants appearance at arraignment has changed. There is no longer a need to file a Notice of Intent to File Waiver of Defendants Appearance. Instead, signed appearance waivers may be electronically filed using the Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgement of Trial Date event. The event is located under Criminal Event Categories: Other Filings/Waivers. The signed waiver needs to be e-filed no later than noon on the Thursday prior to the scheduled arraignment. (MYE)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
89 89 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Osmar Martinez-Ochoa, Hector Martinez-Ochoa, Oscar Alberto Martinez, Carlos Fernando Perea, Joel Rafael Ruelas, Alejandra Valenzuela. (ADI-KAH, )
Related: [-]