Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:R Barclay Surrick
Case #: 2:20-cv-05034
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 12, 2020
Terminated:Feb 23, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 10, 2021 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
TUMAR ALEXANDER
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
FRANK BRESLIN
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
DIANA P. CORTES
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
BRIAN R. CULLIN
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
KELLY DIFFILY
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
JANET HAAS, M.D.
Represented By
ARIANNA K. MCLAUGHLIN
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
BRIAN P. FLAHERTY
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
JAMES KENNEY
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
MARISSA O'CONNELL
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
MARCEL S. PRATT
Represented By
MEGHAN A. BYRNES
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
LYDIA M. FURST
City Of Philadelphia Law Department
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION
Represented By
ARIANNA K. MCLAUGHLIN
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
BRIAN P. FLAHERTY
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES. 1-15
Defendant
HON. Joshua Roberts
Represented By
MARTHA GALE
Administrative Office Of Pa Courts
contact info
Plaintiff
ELS REALCO LLC
Represented By
RICHARD J. SILVERBERG
contact info
Plaintiff
RICHARD J. SILVERBERG
Represented By
RICHARD J. SILVERBERG
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/23 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG (SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/22 9:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA P. CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL, MARCEL S. PRATT.(BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Friday, February 19, 2021
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/19 5:08 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION. (FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/18 2:31 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS LETTER REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, JAMES KENNEY, TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, MARCEL PRATT, DIANA CORTES, MARISSA O' CONNELL, BRIAN CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, AND DEFENDANTS THE WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION AND JANET HAAS, MD SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN TWO WEEKS OF THE COURT'S RULING ON THE CITY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/18/21. 2/18/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 02/17 12:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Joshua Roberts. (GALE, MARTHA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
25 25 motion Stay Tue 02/16 7:30 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Case filed by TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA P. CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL, MARCEL S. PRATT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stay Tue 02/16 6:06 PM
MOTION to Stay the Proceedings filed by JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/16 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ARIANNA K. MCLAUGHLIN on behalf of JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(MCLAUGHLIN, ARIANNA)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/16 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. FLAHERTY on behalf of JANET HAAS, M.D., WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION with Certificate of Service(FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/16 10:38 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION for Sanctions filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG, ELS REALCO LLC.(SILVERBERG, RICHARD) Modified on 2/16/2021 (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh. A,
Att: 2 Exh. B,
Att: 3 Exh. C,
Att: 4 Exh. D,
Att: 5 Exh. E,
Att: 6 Exh. F,
Att: 7 Exh. G
Thursday, February 11, 2021
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/11 9:26 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY 2/22/21. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO CITY DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS BY 2/22/21; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/10/21. 2/11/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/09 2:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Roberts. Joshua Roberts waiver sent on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/29/2020. (GALE, MARTHA)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/09 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA GALE on behalf of Joshua Roberts with Certiicate of Service(GALE, MARTHA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
17 17 motion Sanctions Mon 02/08 2:38 PM
MOTION for Sanctions filed by TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA P. CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL, MARCEL S. PRATT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/08 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LYDIA M. FURST on behalf of TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA P. CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL, MARCEL S. PRATT with Certificate of Service(FURST, LYDIA)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 02/08 10:17 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG..(SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exh. A,
Att: 2 Exh. B,
Att: 3 Exh. C,
Att: 4 Exh. D,
Att: 5 Exh. E,
Att: 6 Exh. F,
Att: 7 Exh. G,
Att: 8 Exh. H,
Att: 9 Exh. I,
Att: 10 Exh. J,
Att: 11 Exh. K,
Att: 12 Exh. L,
Att: 13 Exh. M,
Att: 14 Exh. O,
Att: 15 Exh. P,
Att: 16 Exh. Q
Monday, February 01, 2021
service Summons Issued Mon 02/01 9:10 AM
Summons Issued as to JANET HAAS, M.D., Joshua Roberts, WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF on 2/1/21 (JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/29 6:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG.(SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/21 2:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANET HAAS, M.D.. JANET HAAS, M.D. waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/21 2:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION. WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (FLAHERTY, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARCEL S. PRATT. MARCEL S. PRATT waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARISSA O'CONNELL. MARISSA O'CONNELL waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:23 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by JAMES KENNEY as to JAMES KENNEY., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES KENNEY. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KELLY DIFFILY. KELLY DIFFILY waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRIAN R. CULLIN. BRIAN R. CULLIN waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIANA P. CORTES. DIANA P. CORTES waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FRANK BRESLIN. FRANK BRESLIN waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/15 11:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TUMAR ALEXANDER. TUMAR ALEXANDER waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/15 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MEGHAN A. BYRNES on behalf of TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA P. CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL, MARCEL S. PRATT with Certificate of Service(BYRNES, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
service Summons Issued Tue 10/13 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to TUMAR ALEXANDER, FRANK BRESLIN, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DIANA P. CORTES, BRIAN R. CULLIN, KELLY DIFFILY, JANET HAAS, M.D., JAMES KENNEY, MARISSA O'CONNELL, MARCEL S. PRATT, WILLIAM PENN FOUNDATION. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 10/13/20 (amas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2020
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 10/12 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14630564.), filed by RICHARD J. SILVERBERG.(SILVERBERG, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form
misc Jury Demand Tue 10/13 9:38 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ELS REALCO LLC, RICHARD J. SILVERBERG. (lisad, )
Related: [-]