Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-06639
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2020
Terminated:Mar 25, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
ATC Group Services LLC
5750 Johnson Street Suite 400
Lafayette, LA 70503
Represented By
ATC Group Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kmart Holding Corporation
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Steven J. Reisman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, March 25, 2022
9 9 order So Ordered Stipulation Fri 03/25 1:54 PM
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 3/25/2022 For Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Stipulation Fri 03/25 9:38 AM
Stipulation STIPULATED ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/25 1:55 PM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-6639 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 22, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/22 4:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation.
Related: [-] 6 isman, Steven
6 6 ans Statement Thu 07/22 1:14 PM
Statement Notice of Scheduling of Mediation filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Monday, February 01, 2021
5 5 answer None Mon 02/01 9:49 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Jonathan Adam Grasso on behalf of ATC Group Services LLC. (Grasso, Jonathan)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 01/06 9:16 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Monday, November 09, 2020
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 11/09 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation.
Related: [-] 2 ,1 isman, Steven
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Wed 10/14 12:12 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 10, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Sat 10/10 6:09 PM
Adversary case 20-06639 Complaint against ATC Group Services LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Kmart Holding Corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Att: 1 Exhibit A