Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:18-bk-23538

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:20-ap-06890
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2020
Terminated:Nov 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
White Plains Galleria Limited Partnership
100 N. Sepulveda Blvd.
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
White Plains Galleria Limited Partnership
contact info
Plaintiff
Sears, Roebuck and Co.
3333 Beverly Road
Hoffman Estates, IL 60179
Represented By
Steven J. Reisman
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/17 3:48 PM
Adversary Case 7:20-ap-6890 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
4 4 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 11/10 11:14 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Sears, Roebuck and Co.. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
3 3 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 11/10 11:59 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Sears, Roebuck and Co..
Related: [-] 1 ,2 isman, Steven
Thursday, October 15, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Thu 10/15 1:16 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 10/13 8:37 AM
Adversary case 20-06890 Complaint against White Plains Galleria Limited Partnership (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Sears, Roebuck and Co.. Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
Att: 1 Exhibit A