California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:20-cv-09384
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2020
Terminated:Apr 07, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 11, 2021 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Sportstars, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Antony Marino
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Kristina Marie Fernandez Mabrie
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Andrew L. Lee
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Benson Slavin, II
Represented By
Kristina Marie Fernandez Mabrie
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Rashaan Reed
Represented By
Peter R Ginsberg
Michelman And Robinson LLP
contact info
Christopher L. Frost
Eisner LLP
contact info
Jesse J Contreras
Michelman And Robinson LLP
contact info
Katherine Pierucci
Eisner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 31, 2022
67 67 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 10/31 8:17 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley M Koley counsel for Defendants Ronald Benson Slavin, II, Sportstars, Inc.. Kristina Fernandez Mabrie is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Ashley M. Koley. (Koley, Ashley)
Related: [-]
66 66 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 10/31 4:47 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley M Koley counsel for Defendants Ronald Benson Slavin, II, Sportstars, Inc.. Filed by Defendants SPORTSTARS, INC. and RONALD BENSON SLAVIN II. (Attorney Ashley M Koley added to party Ronald Benson Slavin, II(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley M Koley added to party Sportstars, Inc.(pty:dft))(Koley, Ashley)
Related: [-]