Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:20-cv-00980
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2020
Terminated:Jan 27, 2021
Last checked: Monday Apr 12, 2021 5:44 AM EDT
defendant
Domonique Sasha Appleby
defendant
Brian Poe & Associates, Attorneys at Law, PC
defendant
Capital Solutions Group LLC
defendant
Jeffrey, Parr, and Weinberg LLC
defendant
Main One Mediation Group, LLC
defendant
Tiffany Mia Moore
defendant
Paramount Financial Group, LLC
defendant
Brian David Poe
defendant
Morris Alonzo Thrasher
plaintiff
Donald Newberne
Represented By
Phillip C. Rogers
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Joysha P. Southwell
Terminated: 12/19/2020


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
14 14 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Wed 01/27 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Donald Newberne (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Tue 01/05 11:57 AM
ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents, or response to notice of impending dismissal and order to show cause, to be submitted by 1/27/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
12 12 notice Settlement Mon 01/04 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Mon 01/04 1:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiff to either apply for entry of default as to defendants Brian Poe & Associates, Attorneys at Law, PC, Brian David Poe, and Domonique Sasha Appleby or to show cause in writing by 1/19/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Mon 01/04 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as to defendants Tiffany Mia Moore, Morris Alonzo Thrasher, and Jeffrey, Parr, and Weinberg LLC for failure to serve; verified petition regarding service of process to be submitted by 1/19/2021 or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/21 2:44 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Capital Solutions Group LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Main One Mediation Group, LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Paramount Financial Group, LLC served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party Sat 12/19 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re Joysha P. Southwell without prejudice filed by plaintiff Donald Newberne (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/01 9:19 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Domonique Sasha Appleby served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/01 9:18 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Brian David Poe served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/01 9:17 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Brian Poe & Associates, Attorneys at Law, PC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 10/15 10:54 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Domonique Sasha Appleby, Brian Poe & Associates, Attorneys at Law, PC, Capital Solutions Group LLC, Jeffrey, Parr, and Weinberg LLC, Main One Mediation Group, LLC, Tiffany Mia Moore, Paramount Financial Group, LLC, Brian David Poe, Joysha P. Southwell, Morris Alonzo Thrasher (ns)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Thu 10/15 10:53 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Wed 10/14 9:52 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/14 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Newberne (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Wed 10/14 9:53 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Donald Newberne in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5804171 (Rogers, Phillip)
Related: [-]