Montana District Court
Case #: 6:05-cr-00016
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2005
Terminated:Jun 02, 2006
Defendant
Daniel C. Chudy
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Nov 17 2016
ORDER as to Daniel C. Chudy Defendant's 2016 Risk Assessment Panel Report, warden's letter and recommendation to be filed in the record under seal.. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 11/17/2016. (DED, )
GPO Nov 20 2018
ORDERED: Defendant's 2018 Risk Assessment Panel Report, cover letter, and recommendation shall be filed under seal. The Clerk shall provide hard copies of the report, cover letter, and recommendation to counsel for Defendant and the government. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 11/19/2018. (HEG)
GPO Dec 27 2019
ORDER as to Daniel C. Chudy. Defendant's 2019 Risk Assessment Panel Report, cover letter, and recommendation shall be filed under seal. The Clerk shall provide hard copies of the report, cover letter, and recommendation to counsel for Defendant and the government. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 12/27/2019. (HEG)
GPO Sep 21 2020
ORDER as to Daniel C. Chudy. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 9/21/2020. (HEG)
GPO Oct 19 2020
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW as to Daniel C. Chudy. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 4243() that Defendant Daniel Chudy shall be CONDITIONALLY DISCHARGED from FMC Devens to the Bedford Domiciliary at the Edith Nourse Rogers Memorial Veterans Hospital in Bedford, Massachusetts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Chudy shall be supervised by the United States Probation Office for the District of Massachusetts under the following conditions. (See order) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 4247(e), annual reports shall be filed by the director of the facility in which he is committed with the Court, with copies to the Assistant United States Attorney, Mr. Chudy's Federal Public Defender, and the Warden of the Federal Medical Center Devens, Ayer, Massachusetts. Copy of order to parties as directed. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 10/19/2020. (HEG)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.