California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:20-cv-01989
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause18:0981 Civil Forfeiture
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2020
Terminated:May 11, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 13, 2021 1:56 AM PDT
Claimant
Tarek Greiss
Represented By
Jesse Asher Gessin
contact info
Claimant
South Coast Counseling, Inc.
693 Plumer St.
Costa Mesa, CA 92627
Represented By
John Hanusz
Hanusz Law, PC
contact info
Defendant
176,548.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Victor A Rodgers, Jr
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
46 46 service USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed Tue 09/20 10:02 AM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed upon 176,548.00 in U.S. Currency on 9/15/2022. Remarks: RETURNED $54,848.40 (19-FBI-006237) WITHOUT INTEREST ON 4/22/22. Forfeited $70,619.20 into AFF on 5/19/22. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
45 45 service USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed Tue 07/12 4:22 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed on 6/23/2022. Remarks: Forfeited $70,619.20 (19-FBI-006237) into AFF on 5/19/22. RETURNED $51,080.40 USC (19-FBI-006237) WITHOUT INTEREST ON 6/15/22. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
44 44 judgmentCV Judgment - Consent Thu 05/12 11:25 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT of Forfeiture as to Defendant Currency Claimed by Claimant Estate of Tarek Greiss by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
43 43 5 pgs stip Order Wed 05/11 2:21 PM
STIPULATION for Order STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO ENTER CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO DEFENDANT CURRENCY CLAIMED BY CLAIMANT ESTATE OF TAREK GREISS; [PROPOSED] CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO DEFENDANT CURRENCY CLAIMED BY CLAIMANT ESTATE OF TAREK GREISS LODGED UNDER SEPARATE COVER filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
42 42 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/10 1:17 PM
ORDER Substituting the Estate of Tarek Greiss as Claimant in This Case in Place of Claimant Tarek Greiss by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the stipulation between plaintiff United States of America and claimant Tarek Greiss, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Estate of Tarek Greiss is hereby substituted in this case as claimant in place of Tarek Greiss. IT IS SO ORDERED., re Stipulation for Order,41 (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
41 41 3 pgs stip Order Mon 05/09 1:58 PM
STIPULATION for Order SUBSTITUTING THE ESTATE OF TAREK GREISS AS CLAIMANT IN THIS CASE IN PLACE OF CLAIMANT TAREK GREISS filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, April 25, 2022
40 40 order Continue Tue 04/26 9:25 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM MAY 9, 2022 TO JUNE 27, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M39 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The scheduling conference in this case is continued to June 27, 2022 at 11:00 a.m., and the time for the parties to file their Joint Rule 26(f) report is continued from April 25, 2022 to June 17, 2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Continue Mon 04/25 10:15 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from MAY 9, 2022 to JUNE 27, 2022 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 11, 2022
38 38 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/11 3:04 PM
ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM MARCH 28, 2022 TO MAY 9, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M.36 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Scheduling Conference in this case is continued from March 28, 2022 to May 9, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. and the time for the parties to file their Joint Rule 26(f) report is continued from March 18, 2022 to April 25, 2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
37 37 judgmentCV Judgment - Consent Fri 03/11 2:54 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO DEFENDANT CURRENCY CLAIMED BY CLAIMANT SOUTH COAST COUNSELING, INC.35 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this action and the parties to this Consent Judgment of Forfeiture As To Defendant Currency Claimed By Claimant South Coast Counseling, Inc. (iv)
Related: [-]
36 36 stip Continue Fri 03/11 8:59 AM
STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from MARCH 28, 2022 to MAY 9, 2022 filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
35 35 5 pgs stip Order Fri 03/11 8:45 AM
STIPULATION for Order ENTERING CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE AS TO DEFENDANT CURRENCY CLAIMED BY CLAIMANT SOUTH COAST COUNSELING, INC. filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 02/02 9:21 AM
ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM FEBRUARY 28, 2022 TO MARCH 28, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M.33 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The scheduling conference in this case is CONTINUED to March 28, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. and the time for the parties to file their Joint Rule 26(f) report is continued to March 18, 2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
33 33 3 pgs stip Order Tue 02/01 10:42 AM
STIPULATION for Order STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM FEBRUARY 28, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. TO MARCH 28, 2022 AT 11:00 A.M. filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 27, 2021
32 32 respm Supplement (Motion related) Mon 12/27 6:04 PM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Claimant Estate of Tarek Greiss for Claimant Tarek Greiss 23 filed by Trustee Mary Shipley.(Gessin, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 12/08 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08 and Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE CLAIMANT ESTATE OF TAREK GREISS23 appropriate for submission on the papers without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set on this motion for December 13, 2021 is vacated and taken off calendar. If the Court determines that a hearing is necessary, one will be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
30 30 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 11/29 3:58 PM
REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Claimant Estate of Tarek Greiss for Claimant Tarek Greiss 23 filed by Trustee Mary Shipley. (Gessin, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
29 29 service Service of Summons and Complaint by Publication Tue 11/23 6:15 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant All Defendants. Publication was made in the official government website: www.forfeiture.gov for 30 consecutive days. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/22 7:54 AM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Claimant Estate of Tarek Greiss for Claimant Tarek Greiss 23 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF CLAIMANT TAREK GREISS BASED ON DEATH OR ALTERNATIVELY TO SET A HEARING DATE ON THIS MOTION AFTER JANUARY 1, 2022 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 11/18 4:44 PM
ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE26 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The December 13, 2021 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to February 28, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report shall be filed no later than February 14, 2022. (iv)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 11/18 6:46 AM
Stipulation of Take Off Calendar Scheduling Conference filed by Claimant South Coast Counseling, Inc.(Hanusz, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 22, 2021
25 25 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 10/22 12:45 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 12/13/2021 at 10:00 AM. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/21 7:02 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Claimant South Coast Counseling, Inc..(Hanusz, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 11, 2021
23 23 motion Substitute Party Mon 10/11 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Substitute Claimant Estate of Tarek Greiss for Claimant Tarek Greiss filed by Trustee Mary Shipley. Motion set for hearing on 12/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attorney Jesse Asher Gessin added to party Mary Shipley(pty:trust)) (Gessin, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jesse Gessin,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
22 22 order Stay Case (to Lift) Thu 09/30 9:04 AM
ORDER LIFTING STAY21 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The stay of this action is lifted. Claimant South Coast Counseling, Inc.'s response to the Complaint shall be due no later than October 21, 2021. (iv)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stay Case (to Lift) Wed 09/29 1:32 PM
REQUEST to Lift Stay re PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS REQUEST TO LIFT STAY AND STATUS REPORT; [PROPOSED] ORDER LIFTING STAY LODGED UNDER SEPARATE COVER filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 02, 2021
20 20 misc Status Report Fri 07/02 8:10 AM
STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS REPORT OF THE STATUS OF THE RELATED CRIMINAL CASE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
19 19 misc Status Report Thu 04/01 2:44 PM
STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS REPORT OF THE STATUS OF THE RELATED CRIMINAL CASE filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
18 18 order Staying Case Thu 01/28 10:05 AM
ORDER STAYING CIVIL FORFEITURE ACTION PENDING CONCLUSION OF RELATED CRIMINAL CASE17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter shall be, and hereby is stayed pending the conclusion of the criminal case entitled United States v. Tarek Greiss, Case No. 8:20-cr-00131-MWF. In order to allow the Court to monitor the status of this matter, the government shall file a status report by April 1,2021, and every ninety (90) days thereafter, concerning the progress of the criminal case. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
17 17 stip Stay Case Wed 01/27 12:57 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending CONCLUSION OF RELATED CRIMINAL CASE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON LODGED UNDER SEPARATE COVER filed by plaintiff United States of America.(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 25, 2021
16 16 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/25 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Claimant South Coast Counseling, Inc., (Attorney John Hanusz added to party South Coast Counseling, Inc.(pty:clm))(Hanusz, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 respoth Claim Mon 01/25 4:16 PM
CLAIM filed by Claimant South Coast Counseling, Inc.. (Hanusz, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 01/25 11:30 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 176,548.00 in U.S. Currency, identifying Tarek Greiss and South Coast Counseling. (Attorney Jesse Asher Gessin added to party 176,548.00 in U.S. Currency(pty:dft))(Gessin, Jesse)
Related: [-]
13 13 respoth Claim Mon 01/25 11:27 AM
CLAIM filed by Defendant 176,548.00 in U.S. Currency. (Gessin, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
12 12 service Warrant for Seizure Returned Wed 01/06 2:30 PM
Warrant for seizure returned executed re Warrant for Seizure Issued9 . (twdb)
Related: [-]
11 11 service USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed Wed 01/06 12:44 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed on 12/30/2020. Remarks: SEIZED $176,548.00 (19-FBI-006237) ON 12/30/20. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
10 10 order Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34) Mon 10/19 4:20 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cr-00131 MWF. Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01989 MWF(DFMx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
9 9 misc Warrant for Seizure Issued Thu 10/15 4:19 PM
WARRANT for seizure of $176, 548.00 in U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 10/15 4:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 10/15 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 10/15 11:46 AM
Memorandum Re: Assignment of Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs misc Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment Thu 10/15 11:37 AM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States of America for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 10/15/2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Thu 10/15 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff United States of America. Related Case(s): 8:20-CR-00131-MWF (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Warrant for Seizure Request Thu 10/15 11:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 10/15 11:24 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 10/15 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Victor A Rodgers, Jr added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Rodgers, Victor)
Related: [-]