Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary Jo Heston
Case #: 3:20-bk-42348
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Shilo Inn, Ocean Shores, LLC
707 Ocean Shores Blvd NW
Ocean Shores, WA 98569-9345
Represented By
Bryan T Glover
Stoel Rives, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
533 533 order Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364 (order) Thu 04/24 2:19 PM
Approved Final ORDER for Approval of Post- Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 364(C) Related [+] . (TGR)
Related: [-] 514
532 532 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Thu 04/24 12:02 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
531 531 court Minutes - Hearing Not Held LBR 9013 cw Wed 04/23 3:02 PM
Minutes. Hearing Not Held. Order to be received pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1(f)(2). Related document(s) 524 Final Hearing to Consider Stipulated Motion for Order Authorizing Financing for Insurance Premiums and Related Relief. Notice of agreement reached filed 4/23/2025. (AMT)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Agreement Reached, Agreed Order to be Submitted (no PDF) Wed 04/23 9:33 AM
Notice to Court Agreement Reached, Agreed Order to be Submitted on Date of Hearing: 4/24/2025. Filed by Bryan T Glover on behalf of Shilo Inn, Ocean Shores, LLC. Related [+]. (Glover, Bryan)
Related: [-] 514 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364,525 Generic Notice
Friday, April 18, 2025
misc Notice to Court of Intent to Argue (no PDF) Fri 04/18 10:41 AM
Notice to Court of Intent to Argue. Date of Hearing: 4/24/2025. Filed by Bryan T Glover on behalf of Shilo Inn, Ocean Shores, LLC. Related [+]. (Glover, Bryan)
Related: [-] 514 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364,525 Generic Notice, Set Hearing