Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:20-cv-02413
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2020
Terminated:Aug 09, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 13, 2021 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Represented By
Ernest H. Kohlmyer, III
Shepard, Smith, Kohlmyer & Hand, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC
Represented By
John Philip Gaset
Nelson Mullins Broad And Cassel
contact info
Mediator
James Betts
Represented By
James Robert Betts
James R. Betts, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Daniel Plasencia
Represented By
Frederick Wiley Vollrath
Frederick W. Vollrath, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order dismissing case Wed 10/06 10:22 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/6/2021. (JRF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/05 3:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) with Prejudice by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
23 23 2 pgs order Order dismissing case Fri 08/06 3:51 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2021. (JRF)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of settlement Fri 08/06 12:13 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Justin Daniel Plasencia (Vollrath, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
21 21 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/10 3:41 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 20 the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline Pursuant to Order, (Dkt. 18), and for Order Scheduling Mediation on August 10, 2021. The Parties shall have up to and including August 10, 2021 to conduct mediation with James R. Betts. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2021. (JRF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/29 11:34 AM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE PURSUANT TO ORDER [DE 18] AND FOR ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION ON AUGUST 10, 2021 by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of appearance Tue 04/20 3:07 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE BY ROLAND A. ROSELLO Appearance by Frederick Wiley Vollrath on behalf of Justin Daniel Plasencia (Vollrath, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
18 18 order Case management and scheduling order Mon 12/14 3:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 12/27/2021, Jury Trial set for the FEBRUARY 2022 TRIAL TERM, which commences on January 31, 2022, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/25/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/14/2020. (CRB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
17 17 misc Case Management Report Mon 11/30 4:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 22, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Sun 11/22 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Justin Daniel Plasencia. (Vollrath, Frederick)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Sun 11/22 2:59 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Justin Daniel Plasencia. Related case(s): No (Vollrath, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/16 5:30 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC.(Gaset, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/09 9:02 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 12 Defendant Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (DE 1). Defendant Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC shall have up to and including November 16, 2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/9/2020. (AKJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 11/06 4:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC. (Gaset, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 11/06 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Fri 11/06 9:50 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. Related case(s): no (Kohlmyer, Ernest)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/06 9:46 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC.(Kohlmyer, Ernest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
8 8 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Wed 10/28 11:18 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC. Related case(s): no (Gaset, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Wed 10/28 11:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BLACKSTONE GROUP L.P. for Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC.. (Gaset, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Wed 10/28 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Philip Gaset on behalf of Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC (Gaset, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
5 5 order Interested persons order Thu 10/22 8:48 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/22/2020. (CRB)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Related case order and track 2 notice Thu 10/22 8:47 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/22/2020. (CRB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2020
3 3 service Summons issued Fri 10/16 9:50 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC. (LYB)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons issued Fri 10/16 9:49 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC. (LYB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/16 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC, Inphynet Contracting Services, LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number TPA-62149 filed by Justin Daniel Plasencia.(LYB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet