Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey S White |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-07331 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 17, 2021 3:07 AM PDT |
Amicus
U.S. Tech Workers
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Immigration Council
American Immigration Council 1331 G Street NW Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Council on Education and 23 Other Higher Education Organizations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
46 Leading U.S. Companies
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Al Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Labor
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Colleges and Universities
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Syed Nazim Ali
65 Washington St #225
Santa Clara, CA 95050 |
|
Plaintiff
University of Southern California
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
University of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARUP Laboratories
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
University of Rochester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Retail Federation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cornell University
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America
1615 H Street, NW
Washington, DC 20062 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Institute of Technology
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bay Area Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia
Terminated: 03/19/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sec. Homeland Secty Chad F. Wolf
Terminated: 03/19/2021
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stanford University
Terminated: 03/19/2021
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Association of Manufacturers
Terminated: 03/19/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
158 | 158 1 pgs JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 15, 2021. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) | |
157 | 157 8 pgs ORDER GRANTING 140 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 144 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 15, 2021. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) | |
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
156 | 156 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2021 re: 140] MOTION for Summary Judgment and 144 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: Paul Hughes. Defendant Attorney: August Flentje; Alexandra Saslaw. Attachment: Minute Order. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2021) | |
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
155 | 155 NOTICE of Appearance by August Flentje (Flentje, August) | |
154 | 154 NOTICE of Additional Authorities by ARUP Laboratories, American Association of International Healthcare Recruitment, Bay Area Council, California Institute of Technology, Chamber of Commerce of the United State of America, Cornell University, National Retail Federation, Presidents Alliance on Higher Education and Immigration, Stanford University, University of Rochester, University of Southern California, University of Utah(Hughes, Paul) Modified on 9/10/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
153 | 153 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO COMPLY WITH 152 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Counsel has not complied with the following: Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel who will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 pm ON September 9, 2021. Counsel shall submit the required information forthwith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) | |
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
152 | 152 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING ON 09/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM FOR CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel who will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A l ist of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 09/09/2021 by 12:00 pm PDT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (jjoS, COURT STAFF) | |
151 | 151 Notice of Tentative Ruling and Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/8/21. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) | |
Set/Reset Deadlines as to144 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ,140 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2021 09:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) |