Foley v. Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc. dba Nutrafol
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Skretny |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01532 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 18, 2021 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ian Foley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ian Foley (Sweet, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
order
Text Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 11/17 10:18 AM
TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the Defendant's5 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. The Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 11/17/2020. (JCM) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint / Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc..(Drayton, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Drayton on behalf of Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc. (Drayton, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ian Foley. Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc. served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Sweet, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, October 21, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc. (JD) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 10/21 11:10 AM
Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Wed 10/21 11:11 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] .(JD) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/21 11:11 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JD) |
||
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Nutraceutical Wellness, Inc. dba Nutrafol $ 400 receipt number 0209-4017971, filed by Ian Foley.(Sweet, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |