California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Margaret M Mann
Case #: 3:20-bk-05195
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Aug 18, 2022

Debtor
Emerald Health Bioceuticals, Inc.
5910 Pacific Center Blvd Ste 300
San Diego, CA 92121-6303
Represented By
Jon Cooper
Jon M. Cooper, Apc
contact info
Last checked: never
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 10/21/2020 12:01 AM PDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
1 1 69 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) - case upload Tue 10/20 10:09 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules A-J & Statement of Financial Affairs Fee Amount $ 335.00 filed by Jon Cooper of Jon M. Cooper, APC on behalf of Emerald Health Bioceuticals, Inc.. Declaration re: Electronic Filing due by 11/17/2020, (Cooper, Jon)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (CSD 1801) Tue 10/20 10:09 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Jon Cooper on behalf of Emerald Health Bioceuticals, Inc.. Related [+] (Cooper, Jon)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
3 3 crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Tue 10/20 10:32 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 20-05195 7] ) [misc,1027u] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 335.00 Receipt number A16324426 Related [+]; (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1