Brooklyn Roasting Works, LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth S Stong |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-43683 |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2020 |
Dismissed: | Mar 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Brooklyn Roasting Works, LLC
63 Flushing Ave, Building 123 Brooklyn Navy Yard
Brooklyn, NY 11205 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
1. | Brooklyn Roasting Company Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (dailycoffeenews.com) |
Submitted Mon 10/26/2020 | |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
120 | 120
![]() Order to Close Dismissed Case. Signed on 3/26/2021 (jmf) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 03/26 8:27 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jmf) |
||
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
119 | 119
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Dismissal Notice Date 03/25/2021. (Admin.) |
|
118 | 118
![]() Order Directing the Clerk of Court to Close 20-43683 Brooklyn Roasting Works, LLC and all jointly administered cases by March 26, 2021. It is so Ordered. . Signed on 3/25/2021 (cns) |
|
117 | 117
![]() Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 0 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $3107230.13, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Gerard R Luckman Esq.. (Luckman, Gerard) |
|
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
116 | 116
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Notice Date 03/24/2021. (Admin.) |
|
115 | 115
![]() Letter Requesting Closure of Debtors Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Kathleen M Aiello on behalf of Brooklyn Roasting Works, LLC (Aiello, Kathleen) |
|
114 | 114
![]() Statement /Declaration of Tracy L. Klestadt Confirming Distributions Made in Connection with Dismissal of the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Kathleen M Aiello on behalf of Brooklyn Roasting Works, LLC (Aiello, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
113 | 113
![]() Order Dismissing the Chapter 11 (Subchapter V) Cases with Notice of Dismissal . Signed on 3/23/2021. (vea) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
112 | 112
![]() Order Granting First and Final Fee Applications, as Amended or Supplemented, of the Chapter 11 Professionals. Granting for Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard and Stevens LLP, fees awarded: $120,000.00, expenses awarded: $1,474.44; Granting for Gerard R Luckman, fees awarded: $16,000.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 . Signed on 3/22/2021 (vea) |
|
111 | 111
![]() Stipulation and Order by and between the Debtors, through their respective Counsel and Michael Pollack as Guarantor, and 25 Jay Street LLC, through their respective Counsel, Resolving all Claims upon Dismissal of Chapter 11 Cases. In exchange for the withdrawal of the Jay Street Claim and support of the dismissal of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases, the Debtors will pay $75,000 to the Jay Street Landlord in full and final settlement of all claims and open issues between the Debtors and the Jay Street Landlord. In Exchange for the Guarantor Release, the Guarantor agrees to pay the Jay Street Landlord $125,000 in full and final settlement of all claims and open issues between the Guarantor and the Jay Street Landlord. Upon the receipt by the Jay Street Landlord of both the Debtors Settlement Payment and the Guarantor Settlement Payment, the Lease and Guaranty shall be deemed to be cancelled, terminated, null and void and of no further force or effect. Signed on 3/22/2021. (vea) |
|
110 | 110
![]() Stipulation and Order of Settlement of Objections to Confirmation of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Plan, by and between the Debtors, through their Respective Counsel, and Landlords 55 Washington Street LLC, 50 West 23rd Street A LLC, and 50 West 23rd Street B LLC, through their Respective Counsel. The Landlords hereby withdraw all Objections to confirmation of the Plan. The Debtors shall pay the Landlords the total sum of $187,500, payable as follows: a) $125,000 in cash on the Effective Date of the Plan or upon entry of order dismissing the Chapter 11 cases; and b) the balance of $62,500 to be made in five consecutive monthly installments of $12,500. In consideration of the payments provided, the 55 Washington Landlord shall grant the Debtors a License of up to 15 days to close-down the Washington Street Premises. Signed on 3/22/2021. (vea) |
|
109 | 109
![]() Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 03/19/21. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency]. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 03/29/2021. Redaction Request Due By 04/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/22/2021. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 06/21/2021 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (J&J Court Transcribers Inc) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
108 | 108
![]() Withdrawal of Claim Number(s): 10 Filed by NYC Department of Finance. (tmk) |
|
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK)
Mon 03/22 11:36 AM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Debtor, Trustee, UST, 50 West 23rd Street LLC, Michael Pollack and 25 Jay Street LLC; MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 3/19/21 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Mon 03/22 1:22 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Debtor, Trustee, UST, 50 West 23rd Street LLC, Pollack, Potter, Frankfather and 25 Jay Street LLC; Granted as reflected in the record - Objection withdrawn in part as reflected in the record. Submit order on consent as to form of UST and Subchapter V trustee. (sej) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK)
Mon 03/22 1:32 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Debtor, Trustee, UST, 50 West 23rd Street LLC, Pollack, Potter, Frankfather and 25 Jay Street LLC; MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 3/19/21 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Mon 03/22 1:34 PM
Hearing Held; ; Appearance by Debtor, Trustee, UST, 50 West 23rd Street LLC, Pollack, Potter, Frankfather and 25 Jay Street LLC - No opposition - Granted as modified as reflected in the record - Submit order (sej) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Mon 03/22 1:35 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Debtor, Trustee, UST, 50 West 23rd Street LLC, Pollack, Potter, Frankfather and 25 Jay Street LLC - MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 3/19/21 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sej) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Mon 03/22 1:36 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance by Debtor, Trustee, UST, 50 West 23rd Street LLC, Pollack, Potter, Frankfather and 25 Jay Street LLC - No opposition - Granted as modified as reflected in the record - Submit order (sej) |