Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50928
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Oct 19, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Egypt Valley Stone, LLC
66901 Egypt North Road
Morristown, OH 43759
Represented By
Egypt Valley Stone, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/19 10:05 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50928 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/18 4:45 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
18 18 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Wed 07/28 2:28 PM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 09/27/2021. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 23, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Service Fri 07/23 6:24 PM
Notice of Service Defendant Egypt Valley Stone's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff Filed by Egypt Valley Stone, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
16 16 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 06/01 3:22 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Service Thu 04/22 10:52 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Egypt Valley Stone, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 03, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/04 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
13 13 court VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Wed 03/31 5:43 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 6/1/2021. Signed on 3/31/2021. (FMo)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Wed 03/31 9:54 AM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Egypt Valley Stone, LLC . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:22 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:52 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
8 8 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 11:46 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
6 6 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/10 10:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Egypt Valley Stone, LLC Mediation due date: 04/9/2021. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 12:44 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Egypt Valley Stone, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 12:43 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50928 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:25 PM
Adversary case 20-50928 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Egypt Valley Stone, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives