Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50929
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jan 28, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Force Drilling, LLC
130 Meadow Ridge Road Suite 25
Mt. Morris, PA 15349
Represented By
Force Drilling, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 28, 2021
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 01/28 10:55 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/28 4:47 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50929 Closed. (FMo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:52 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 11:48 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Stipulation Wed 12/23 9:29 AM
Stipulation for Second Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Force Drilling LLC . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. Related [+]. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,1
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
5 5 motion Stipulation Tue 12/08 12:36 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Force Drilling LLC . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 12:46 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Force Drilling, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50929 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:29 PM
Adversary case 20-50929 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Force Drilling, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives