Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50930
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jan 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.
5201 West 86th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46268
Represented By
Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, January 29, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/29 11:25 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/29 1:46 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50930 Closed. (FMo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 12:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 15 ,17
17 17 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 12/30 8:50 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
15 15 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 11:48 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/28 3:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc. Mediation due date: 04/27/2021.(Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
12 12 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
11 11 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 12/09 7:53 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Nathan T. Danielson Related [+] Order Signed on 12/9/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 12/09 7:52 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice James P. Molo Related [+] Order Signed on 12/9/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 12/08 5:33 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nathan T. Danielson, Bose, McKinney & Evans LLP . Receipt Number ADEDC-3383, Filed by Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 12/08 5:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of James P. Moloy, Bose McKinney & Evans LLP . Receipt Number 0311-28486, Filed by Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 12/08 5:27 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/08 12:28 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 12/8/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/08 10:26 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
misc Add Attorney Tue 12/08 5:29 PM
Attorney Mark R. Owens and Kevin G. Collins for Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc., James P. Moloy and Kevin G. Collins for Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc., Nathan T. Danielson and Kevin G. Collins for Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc. added to case Filed by Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 12:49 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 12:48 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50930 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 1:34 PM
Adversary case 20-50930 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Gwinnup's Restoration and Environmental Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives