Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50957
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Sep 17, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wampum Hardware Co.
636 Paden Road
New Galilee, PA 16141
Represented By
Wampum Hardware Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 17, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/17 8:51 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50957 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/16 1:37 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Service Wed 03/03 11:49 AM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Filed by Wampum Hardware Co.. (Grivner, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:41 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
14 14 answer Response Thu 02/11 3:02 PM
Response / Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 USC 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 USC 503 Related [+] Filed by Wampum Hardware Co. (Grivner, Karen)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/26 8:04 AM
ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 1/26/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, January 25, 2021
12 12 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 01/25 2:20 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Second Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:23 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/14 9:35 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 12/14/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, December 11, 2020
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 12/11 2:32 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:46 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Wampum Hardware Co.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:46 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50957 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:26 PM
Adversary case 20-50957 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Wampum Hardware Co.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives