California Central Bankruptcy Court
Case #: 6:94-ap-02504
Case Filed:Jun 16, 1994
Terminated:Jan 30, 1995

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, February 26, 2021
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 02/26 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 45 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
45 45 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Wed 02/24 2:29 PM
Order Denying Motion to Compel Post-Judgment Discovery Responses (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - It is Ordered that the Motioni s denied without prejudice. Signed on 2/24/2021 (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35
Thursday, February 18, 2021
44 44 court Hearing Held (Motion) Fri 02/19 1:19 PM
Document/Hearing Held - DENIED - without prejudice - Related [+] (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Generic Motion filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company
Thursday, February 04, 2021
43 43 misc Proof of service Thu 02/04 11:23 AM
Proof of service Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company Related [+]. (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Motion
Monday, February 01, 2021
42 42 5 pgs misc Supplemental Mon 02/01 3:58 PM
Supplemental to the motion to compel Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company . (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Declaration Mon 02/01 3:57 PM
Declaration in support of Filed by Related [+]. (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Motion
Thursday, December 03, 2020
40 40 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 12/03 3:40 PM
Document/Hearing Continued Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Generic Motion filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company
court Hearing Continued (Motion) Thu 12/03 3:10 PM
Hearing (Adv Motion) Continued Related [+] Hearing to be held on 02/18/2021 at 09:30 AM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 302 Riverside, CA 92501 for35 , (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 GENERIC MOTION filed by The Cadle Company
Monday, October 26, 2020
39 39 court Hearing Set (Motion) Mon 10/26 2:47 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 12/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Generic Motion filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company
38 38 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 10/26 2:45 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company Related [+]. The Hearing date is set for 12/3/2020 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Motion and Notice to Compel Post Judgment Discovery Responses Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
36 36 6 pgs misc Memorandum of points and authorities Wed 10/21 10:02 AM
Memorandum of points and authorities in Support of the Motion to Compel Related [+] Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company . (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] lated to docket entry #35
Monday, October 19, 2020
37 37 misc Affidavit Wed 10/21 10:03 AM
Affidavit of Assly Sayyar, Esq. in Support of Motion to Compel Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company Related [+]. (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 35 Motion
35 35 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Wed 10/21 10:00 AM
Motion and Notice to Compel Post Judgment Discovery Responses Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company (Potier, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
34 34 court Writ of execution Tue 10/20 7:09 PM
Writ of execution - Copy - Original issued September 30, 2019, Filed by Assly Sayyar, attorney for The Cadle Company, Judgment Assignees of Record (English, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
33 33 misc Affidavit Tue 10/20 7:06 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Filed by Other Professional The Cadle Company . (English, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 1994
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/20 6:17 PM
Complaint by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., a New York Corporation against John Joseph Robinson . ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (65 (Dischargeability - other)) (English, Melissa) COMMENT: Docket entry #1 thru #34 previously docketed. Docket entry #33 and #34 re-docketed to reflect PDF's. Modified on 10/20/2020 (English, Melissa)
Related: [-]