Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12822

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:20-ap-00327
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Paul Goldschlag
2001 North Ocean Blvd., Apt. 905
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33305
Represented By
Paul Goldschlag
contact info
Plaintiff
Zvi Guttman
Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. 100 Light Street
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Emily Devan
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, February 08, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/08 11:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-327 Closed. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 23, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sun 01/24 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Judgment
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sun 01/24 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, January 21, 2021
13 13 order Judgment Thu 01/21 6:50 AM
Judgment Entered For: Zvi Guttman, Chapter 11 Trustee. Judgment Entered Against: Defendant Paul Goldschlag in the amount of $94,416.66, comprised of$94,066.66 in damages, and $350.00 in costs. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment Thu 01/21 6:47 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment - NO TIMELY OPPOSITION. Related [+]. Default judgment is entered in favor of Zvi Guttman, Chapter 11 Trustee, against Defendant Paul Goldschlag, in the amount of $94,416.66, comprised as follows: $94,066.66 in damages; and $350.00 in costs. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Zvi Guttman,2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
11 11 apmisc Support Document Wed 12/23 8:26 AM
Support Document Filed by Emily Devan Related [+]. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, December 10, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK (Auto-Docket) Fri 12/11 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant Paul Goldschlag
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
9 9 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/09 2:16 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Zvi Guttman Related [+]. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Notice of Motion
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 12/08 4:17 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Paul Goldschlag Related [+]. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
7 7 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Tue 12/08 4:10 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Paul Goldschlag 10/26/2020. (Aure, Lia) Modified on 12/8/2020 (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
6 6 apmisc Request Tue 12/08 1:55 PM
Request for on behalf of Zvi Guttman for Entry of Default Filed by Emily Devan Related [+]. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 12/08 1:46 PM
Affidavit Re: Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by Emily Devan Related [+]. (Devan, Emily) Modified on 12/8/2020. CLERK'S NOTE: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED. SEE7 . (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Thu 10/29 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
Monday, October 26, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 10/26 9:43 AM
Summons Issued on Paul Goldschlag Date Issued 10/26/2020, Answer Due 11/25/2020 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 01:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Thursday, October 22, 2020
2 2 6 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/22 2:12 PM
Amended Complaint for Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers by Emily Devan on behalf of Zvi Guttman against Paul Goldschlag. Related [+]. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zvi Guttman
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Revision Redlined Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Thu 10/22 12:53 PM
Adversary case 20-00327 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint by Emily Devan on behalf of Zvi Guttman against Paul Goldschlag. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Devan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A