Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Case #: 1:20-cv-03170
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2020
Terminated:Mar 28, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 20, 2021 3:25 AM MDT
Defendant
Does 1-17
Defendant
Damian Bray
Defendant
Hector Jaramilo
Plaintiff
Fallen Productions, Inc.
Represented By
Kerry Steven Culpepper
Culpepper Ip, Lllc
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kelton Wade Shriver
Terminated: 02/02/2021
Defendant
MIRANDA LOUISE DEWITT
Terminated: 02/02/2021
Defendant
Justin McWhorter
Terminated: 03/22/2021
Defendant
Robert O'Brien
Terminated: 04/01/2021
Defendant
Andrew Paterson
Terminated: 03/25/2021
Represented By
Thomas P. Howard
Thomas P. Howard LLC
contact info
Defendant
Dale Powers
Terminated: 04/01/2021


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, August 22, 2022
110 110 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 08/22 11:40 AM
ORDER. Stipulation for Turnover of Garnished Funds between Plaintiff and Defendant Jaramilo, by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 8/22/2022.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
109 109 misc Letter Thu 08/18 8:19 PM
LETTER re:108 Stipulation, Joint Letter by Plaintiff and Defendant Hector Jaramillo to Court by Plaintiff Fallen Productions, Inc..(Culpepper, Kerry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service