California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:20-cv-02115
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2020
Terminated:Oct 06, 2022
Case in other court:Solano County Superior Court, FCS053089
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 21, 2021 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Axis Insurance Company
Represented By
Anna Hsia
Zwillgen Law LLP
contact info
Adya Baker, PHV
Zwillgen PLLC
contact info
Defendant
HII Insurance Solutions
Defendant
Health Insurance Innovations, Inc.
Represented By
Lana Halavi
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Mitchell J. Popham
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Lana Halavi
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jamie Mei Cheng
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Defendant
Benefytt Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Mitchell J. Popham
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Lana Halavi
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Jamie Mei Cheng
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaimi O'Brien
Represented By
E. Gerard Mannion
Mannion, Lowe & Oksenendler
contact info
Demian Isaac Oksenendler
Mannion Lowe & Oksenendler
contact info
Plaintiff
Sean O'Brien
Represented By
E. Gerard Mannion
Mannion, Lowe & Oksenendler
contact info
Demian Isaac Oksenendler
Mannion Lowe & Oksenendler
contact info

GPO Nov 04 2020
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/3/2020 GRANTING defendant AXIS until 11/30/2020 to respond to 1 Complaint. (Coll, A)
GPO Mar 19 2021
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/18/21 DENYING 10 motion to remand and GRANTING 7, 10, 15 motions to dismiss. The complaint is DISMISSED in PART with LEAVE to AMEND. Any amended complaint must be FILED within 21 days. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Sep 16 2021
ss through PACER. (Coll, A)ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/16/2021 GRANTING 50 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Jacob Sommer, PHV for Axis Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing acce
GPO Sep 16 2021
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/16/2021. (Coll, A)
GPO Nov 17 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/16/2021 EXTEDING The deadlines as follows: Expert Discovery shall be completed by 1/14/2022; and All Dispositive Motions, except for Motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications shall be heard by 4/15/2022; The plaintiff's request for a scheduling conference to extend deadlines, 54 is DENIED as moot. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Mar 21 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/21/22 EXTENDING case scheduling order deadlines as follows: expert discovery shall be completed by 5/11/22 ; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 7/8/22. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Mar 22 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/21/22 ORDERING that this matter is referred to the court's ADR Coordinator, Sujean Park, for referral to VDRP for the convening of a VDRP session to take place as soon as possible. (Kaminski, H)
GPO May 16 2022
nces, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 12/9/2022. (Coll, A)STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/16/2022 EXTENDING case scheduling order deadlines as follows: expert discovery shall be completed by 9/28/2022; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continua

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, October 06, 2022
order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/06 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2022: This action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the Stipulation for Dismissal, ECF No.67 . Accordingly, the pending Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos.41 and42 , are DENIED as MOOT, and this case is CLOSED with each party to bear its own costs and fees. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
Related: [-]