Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:20-cv-01257
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporti
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2020
Terminated:Jan 14, 2021
Case in other court:Judicial District Court of Bexar County, 281st
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 21, 2021 4:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Randy D Morris
Represented By
Peter C. Blomquist
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
John Busch
Harltine Barger LLP
contact info
James P. McInerny
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer
contact info
Marshall G. Rosenberg
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Randy Morris Realty, LLP
Represented By
Peter C. Blomquist
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
John Busch
Harltine Barger LLP
contact info
James P. McInerny
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer
contact info
Marshall G. Rosenberg
Hartline Barger LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendrick Bolsen
16903 Vista Briar Drive
San Antonio, TX 78247
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Long
16903 Vista Briar Drive
San Antonio, TX 78247
TERMINATED PARTIES
Neutral
Richard B. Farrer
Terminated: 12/15/2020


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, January 14, 2021
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/14 9:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP.(Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Motions No Longer Referred Thu 01/14 10:09 AM
Motions No Longer Referred: (wg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 01/13 9:13 AM
Text Order GRANTING30 Motion to Continue entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline to submit a stipulation of dismissal is February 2, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
30 30 motion Continue Tue 01/12 2:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue on Stipulation filing Date by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP.(Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
order Order on Motion to Strike Wed 12/16 2:16 PM
Text Order MOOTING26 Motion to Strike in light of the filing of29 entered by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
29 29 adr Notice of ADR/Mediation Outcome Tue 12/15 2:20 PM
Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Outcome: Settled during ADR/Mediation.Terminated Neutral Richard B. Farrer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal on or before January 12, 2021.(wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
28 28 misc Response Tue 12/08 10:44 AM
PLAINTIFF'S PRO-SE RESPONSE to27 Response to Motion, by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/07 2:02 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Randy Morris Realty, LLP, re26 MOTION to Strike8 Advisory to the Court,9 Advisory to the Court,25 Answer to Amended Complaint,21 Reply to Response to Motion,18 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Kendrick Bolsen, Plaintiff Elizabeth Long (Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
order Order on Motion to Strike Wed 12/02 1:46 PM
Text Order REFERRING26 Motion to Strike entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. This motion is referred to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer for disposition. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dc3)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 12/02 2:59 PM
MOTION REFERRED: referred26 MOTION to Strike8 Advisory to the Court,9 Advisory to the Court,25 Answer to Amended Complaint,21 Reply to Response to Motion,18 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Referral Judge: Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
utility Notice of Correction Tue 12/01 10:04 AM
Notice of Correction: Edited, removed certain filings not associated with the Motion. re8 Advisory to the Court,9 Advisory to the Court,18 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
26 26 motion Strike Tue 12/01 9:22 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Strike all Defendant's Motions past November 3, 202025 Answer to Amended Complaint,21 Reply to Response to Motion, Modified text on 12/1/2020 (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 27, 2020
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/27 7:04 PM
DEFENDANTS RANDY MORRIS REALTY, LLP D/B/A MORRIS REALTY AND RANDY MORRIS ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand SUBJECT TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP.(Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
24 24 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 11/20 12:50 PM
MEDIATION ORDER re20 Order Referring Case to ADR/Mediation,, ( Mediation Conference set Via Zoom for 12/11/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
23 23 adr ADR Report - Other Wed 11/18 1:53 PM
2nd ADR Report Filed by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long(wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
22 22 misc Response Fri 11/13 4:33 PM
RESPONSE to21 Reply to Response to Motion by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 12, 2020
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/12 4:20 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP, re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Randy D Morris, Defendant Randy Morris Realty, LLP (Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
20 20 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR/Mediation Tue 11/10 10:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR/Mediation. Richard B. Farrer appointed as Neutral. Following the mediation, the Court will be advised only that the case did or did not settle. No other information will be transmitted to the Court by the mediator or any other party. If mediation is unsuccessful,the parties shall submit a proposed Amended Scheduling Order within 14 days after the conclusion of mediation. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
19 19 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 11/10 8:45 AM
ORDER DENIED re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
18 18 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 11/06 4:56 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP. (Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Advisory to the Court Fri 11/06 3:11 PM
PRO-SE PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED ADR REPORT filed by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Fri 11/06 3:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Response Fri 11/06 3:09 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE & OPPOSITION to6 MOTION to Dismiss by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 11/06 3:03 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/06 3:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP amending, filed by Elizabeth Long, Kendrick Bolsen.(wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
12 12 misc Response Fri 11/06 9:34 AM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to6 DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Dismiss by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Filing Fri 11/06 9:33 AM
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE of Filing Alternative Dispute Resolution Report by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long (wg)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/05 11:13 AM
Joint MOTION For Referral to Magistrate Judge for Mediation Only by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP.(Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
9 9 misc Advisory to the Court Wed 11/04 2:58 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT (Non-Consent) by Randy Morris Realty, LLP. (Rosenberg, Marshall) Modified text on 11/4/2020 (wg)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Advisory to the Court Wed 11/04 2:54 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Randy Morris Realty, LLP. (Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 11/03 12:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Randy Morris Realty, LLP. (Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 10/30 7:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP.(Rosenberg, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
5 5 misc State Court Records Fri 10/30 1:41 PM
State Court Records Filed.(Blomquist, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
4 4 motion Remand to State Court Wed 10/28 3:38 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kendrick Bolsen, Elizabeth Long. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/27 10:03 AM
STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
2 2 misc Advisory to the Court Mon 10/26 5:01 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Randy D Morris, Randy Morris Realty, LLP.(Blomquist, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, October 23, 2020
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/23 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Randy Morris Realty, LLP d/b/a Morris Realty (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-14107308), filed by Randy Morris Realty, LLP d/b/a Morris Realty.(Blomquist, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/23 4:34 PM
Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Fri 10/23 4:34 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (wg)
Related: [-]