Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:20-cv-00909
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2020
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 21, 2021 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Joshua D Gregg
123 Thomas Blvd
Michigan City, IN 46360
Plaintiff
Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc
Represented By
David A Given
contact info
Matthew R Kinsman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
38 38 1 pgs misc Mail Returned Tue 09/20 3:43 PM
Mail Returned from Joshua D Gregg as Undeliverable - 23 Order on Motion to Continue. (envelope marked Return to Sender Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward) (jld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/22 5:22 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to36 Stipulation of Dismissal. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 6/22/2022. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
36 36 1 pgs motion Stipulation to Dismiss Tue 06/21 4:26 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
35 35 HEARING held on 5/24/2022 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by attys Given, Kinsman. Dft did not appear. Plaintiff reports that the parties have reached a settlement. Dismissal papers to be filed by 6/24/2022. Bench trial on 5/24/2022 is VACATED. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (mailed to pro se party) (dk)
Related: [-]
minutes Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/24 10:12 AM
HEARING held on 5/24/2022 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by attys Given, Kinsman. Dft did not appear. Plaintiff reports that the parties have reached a settlement. Dismissal papers to be filed by 6/24/2022. Bench trial on 5/24/2022 is VACATED. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (mailed to pro se party) (dk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 05/20 5:05 PM
ORDER denying33 Motion to Continue Bench Trial. The bench trial will proceed as scheduled on May 24, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (EDT) in the Robert L. Miller Jr. Courtroom in South Bend, Indiana. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/20/2022. (Copy mailed & emailed to defendant)(rmc)
Related: [-]
33 33 4 pgs motion Continue Fri 05/20 1:13 PM
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF BENCH TRIAL by Defendant Joshua D Gregg.(jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Envelope
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
32 32 trial Witness List Wed 05/18 3:48 PM
Witness List by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
31 31 9 pgs order Pretrial Order Fri 05/13 9:53 AM
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. All stipulations of fact shall be submitted in writing to the court no later than 5/18/2022, at 5:00 PM EDT. Also, no later than 5/18/2022, at 5:00 PM EST, each party shall file a list of trial witnesses, by name, who are actually expected to be called to testify at trial. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 5/13/22. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
30 30 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/12/2022 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by atty Given. Dft did not appear. The court discussed trial preparation and procedures. Final pretrial order to be entered. One-day bench trial to proceed on 5/24/2022. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk) (mailed to pro se party).
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Final Thu 05/12 4:25 PM
FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 5/12/2022 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by atty Given. Dft did not appear. The court discussed trial preparation and procedures. Final pretrial order to be entered. One-day bench trial to proceed on 5/24/2022. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk) (mailed to pro se party)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 05, 2022
29 29 9 pgs trial Proposed Findings of Fact Thu 05/05 8:02 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
28 28 10 pgs misc Proposed Pretrial Order Thu 04/28 8:14 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 11 pgs trial Trial Brief Thu 04/28 8:13 PM
TRIAL BRIEF by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
26 26 trial Witness List/Exhibit List Thu 04/14 9:12 PM
Witness List/Exhibit List and Contentions by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
25 25 1 pgs notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 03/08 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua D Gregg from 1251 William D Tate Ave, Suite 1957, Grapevine, TX 76051 to 400 Las Colinas Blvd E, Suite 220, Irving, TX 75039.(kms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Envelope
Friday, February 18, 2022
24 24 2 pgs discov Disclosure Fri 02/18 7:26 PM
DISCLOSURE of Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure filed by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc.(Kinsman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 239 pgs Exhibit A - Expert Report
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/25 12:01 PM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (Jury trial set in error) (dk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 01/05 10:16 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Continue; The court CONTINUES 2-day Bench Trial to 5/24/2022 09:30 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Damon R Leichty; Final Pretrial Conference to 5/12/2022 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Damon R Leichty; and all associated deadlines as outlined in21 Memorandum and Order. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/5/22. (mailed to pro se party)(dk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
22 22 4 pgs motion Continue Wed 12/29 4:53 PM
MOTION to Continue Bench Trial, Final Pretrial Conference and All Associated Deadlines by Plaintiff Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
21 21 6 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 09/07 10:18 AM
MEMORANDUM OF STATUS CONFERENCE & ORDER CONCERNING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND BENCH TRIAL: The plaintiff is directed to prepare and file the proposed joint final pretrial order. The parties must exchange contentions, witnesses, and exhibit lists consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3), albeit pursuant to this orders timing rather than the timing of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3)(B). The court sets a final pretrial conference for 1/31/2022 at 1:30 p.m.; and a two-day bench trial to commence at 9:30 a.m. on 2/14/2022 in the third-floor courtroom in South Bend, Indiana. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 9/7/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
20 20 3 pgs notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 08/03 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua D Gregg from Michigan City, Indiana to 1251 William D Tate Ave, Suite 1957, Grapevine, TX 76051 as of 7/26/2021 (jld)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 07/09 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Zoom Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Damon R Leichty to select a trial date. Zoom connection link to be forwarded to the parties by email. (mailed to pro se party) (dk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 06/29 4:16 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Element Materials Technology Holding USA, Inc.'s motion for judgment on the pleadings as to liability against Joshua Gregg9 . The Court will schedule a trial for damages alone. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 6/29/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/14 8:53 AM
Amended Pleadings Deadline terminated. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
17 17 5 pgs respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 06/14 8:52 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Joshua D Gregg. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
16 16 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 06/04 3:34 PM
MOTION HEARING held via Zoom on 6/4/2021 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by atty Given. Dft appeared pro se re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. The court hears from the parties. For reasons stated, the court takes the matter under advisement. Defendant ordered to file amended answer by 6/11/2021. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk) (mailed to pro se party)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
15 15 utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 05/21 12:56 PM
NOTICE: At the defendant's request, Zoom hearing on9 motion for judgment on the pleadings is CONTINUED to 6/4/2021 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Damon R Leichty. Connection link forwarded by email. (mailed to pro se party) (dk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 04/29 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 02:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Damon R Leichty via Zoom. Parties should also be prepared to discuss the order at docket13 . Zoom connection link to be forwarded by email. (mailed to pro se party) (dk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/07 12:03 PM
ORDER: The court ORDERS Mr. Gregg to amend his answer by 4/21/2021 as outlined in Order. The court will then consider Elements Materials' motion9 in light of the amended answer. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 4/7/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
12 12 5 pgs misc Letter Thu 02/11 2:13 PM
Letter from Joshua Gregg re: including all details in this process. (jld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Envelope
Monday, January 11, 2021
11 11 5 pgs notice Notice - Other Mon 01/11 6:39 PM
NOTICE by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Given, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 13 pgs respm Brief in Support Mon 01/11 6:31 PM
BRIEF in Support of9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Given, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 01/11 6:29 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc.(Given, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of Matthew Kinsman,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of David Given
Friday, January 08, 2021
8 8 3 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/11 2:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Joshua D Gregg.(kms)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/11 2:12 PM
Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance, by Joshua D Gregg(kms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Envelope
Friday, October 30, 2020
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 10/30 9:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint Personally served on Joshua Gregg on 10/29/2020, filed by Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. (Kinsman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/02 10:25 AM
Set Answer Deadline pursuant to DE6 . Answer due 11/19/2020. (bas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 10/26 8:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Element Materials Technology Holding USA Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc) (lhc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/26/2020) Corrected summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/26 8:50 AM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/23 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A Given on behalf of Element Materials Technology Holdings USA Inc (Given, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/23 5:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Element Materials Technology Holdings USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent Herculean US Holdings Inc for Element Materials Technology Holdings USA Inc.. (Kinsman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/23 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Kinsman on behalf of Element Materials Technology Holdings USA Inc (Kinsman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/23 5:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Joshua D Gregg( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4379985.), filed by Element Materials Technology Holdings USA Inc.(Kinsman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Summons to Joshua D. Gregg