Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:20-cr-02113
Case Filed:Oct 21, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Oct 24, 2020 12:26 AM MST
Defendant
Ryan Joseph Praedel (1)
Represented By
Walter Ivan Goncalves, Jr
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert A Fellrath
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/24/2020 1:05 AM MST
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
Arrest of Ryan Joseph Praedel on 8/26/2020. (ADI-REC, ) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ryan Joseph Praedel. (ADI-REC, ) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Ryan Joseph Praedel held on 8/28/2020. The Court will take judicial notice of the PTS report and find the defendant is indigent and appoint counsel. Walter Ivan Goncalves, Jr is appointed counsel for Ryan Joseph Praedel with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant has consulted with the duty AFPD attorney and consents to appearing via video-conference. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing as to Ryan Joseph Praedel held on 8/28/2020. PTS recommends release. Government has no objection. Defendant is present, consents to appearing via video-conference and is in custody. Preliminary Hearing as to Ryan Joseph Praedel waived on 8/28/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Appearances : AUSA Heather Sechrist, duty for the Government, AFPD Gregory Berger, duty for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. The Magistrate Referral is Judge Markovich. Related [+] Hearing held 2:20 pm to 3:40 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ryan Joseph Praedel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 8/28/20.(BHA) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 MINUTE ORDER: as to Ryan Joseph Praedel, Added attorney Robert A Fellrath for USA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
6 6 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Ryan Joseph Praedel. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-KL, ) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 14, 2020
7 7 NOTICE of Intent to Destroy Contraband by USA as to Ryan Joseph Praedel. (Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
8 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Ryan Joseph Praedel.(Fellrath, Robert) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 21, 2020
9 9 ORDER AND FINDINGS OF FACT IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO INDICT granting8 First Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Ryan Joseph Praedel (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 9/21/20. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE) [4:20-mj-04925-N/A-EJM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
10 10 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Ryan Joseph Praedel (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. Arraignment set for 11/10/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau in Courtroom 5C. TRIAL date is 12/22/2020 at 9:30 AM, PLEA DEADLINE set 12/4/2020. NOTE: The process for waiving defendants appearance at arraignment has changed. There is no longer a need to file a Notice of Intent to File Waiver of Defendants Appearance. Instead, signed appearance waivers may be electronically filed using the Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgement of Trial Date event. The event is located under Criminal Event Categories: Other Filings/Waivers. The signed waiver needs to be e-filed no later than noon on the Thursday prior to the scheduled arraignment.(BAC)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
12 12 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Ryan Joseph Praedel. (ADI-KAH, )
Related: [-]