Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Elizabeth M Timothy
Case #: 3:20-cv-05906
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2020
Terminated:Jun 10, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 25, 2021 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
ROBERT DYE
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER E VARNER
Defendant
DOUG UNDERHILL
Defendant
ALLISON PERDUE ROGERS
Defendant
CHARLES V PEPPLER
Defendant
LUMON MAY
Defendant
JENNIE M KINSEY
Defendant
NICHOLAS GEEKER
Defendant
THOMAS DANNHEISER
Defendant
JEFF BERGOSH
Defendant
ROBERT BENDER
Defendant
STEVEN BARRY
Defendant
MICHAEL ALLEN
Defendant
ESCAMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Plaintiff
EARNEST STANBERRY, JR
8719 ORANGE AVENUE
PENSACOLA, FL 32534
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
LINDA F STANBERRY
Terminated: 02/09/2021
8719 ORANGE AVE
PENSACOLA, FL 32534

GPO Feb 09 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED that the clerk is directed to terminate Linda Stanberry as a Plaintiff. It is also respectfully RECOMMENDED: Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF Doc. 12) be dismissed. The clerk be directed to close this file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/9/2021. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/9/2021. (blr)
GPO Jun 10 2021
ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/10/2021. (alb)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 06/16 3:27 PM
ORDER re 19 Motion for Reconsideration. On consideration, the motion is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/16/2021. (blr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
19 19 motion Reconsideration Tue 06/15 3:34 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR. (blr)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 06/15 3:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:19 MOTION for Reconsideration re17 Order. (blr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 10, 2021
18 18 order Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion) Thu 06/10 3:39 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 17 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. 90 Day Deadline set for destruction of working file 9/8/2021. (alb)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Thu 06/10 3:33 PM
ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/10/2021. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 06/01 2:30 PM
ORDER re 15 Motion to the Courts. On consideration, the motion is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/1/2021. (blr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 05/28 10:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:15 MOTION TO THE COURTS. (blr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/28 10:12 AM
MOTION TO THE COURTS by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR. (blr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 02/23 11:24 AM
*** NO ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE:*** Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:14 Objection to Report and Recommendations, titled "Response to Judge Hope Thia [sic] Cannon". (blr) Modified to add no action required by magistrate judge on 2/23/2021 (blr)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 02/23 2:09 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:14 Objection to Report and Recommendations, titled "Response to Judge Hope Thia [sic] Cannon". (blr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
14 14 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Tue 02/23 11:19 AM
OBJECTION to13 Report and Recommendations, titled "Response to Judge Hope Thia [sic] Cannon". by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR. (blr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
13 13 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 02/09 2:16 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED that the clerk is directed to terminate Linda Stanberry as a Plaintiff. It is also respectfully RECOMMENDED: Plaintiff's amended complaint (ECF Doc. 12 ) be dismissed. The clerk be directed to close this file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/9/2021. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/9/2021 . (blr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 01/14 12:12 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:12 Amended Complaint. (No service copies). (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/14 12:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL ALLEN, STEVEN BARRY, ROBERT BENDER, JEFF BERGOSH, THOMAS DANNHEISER, ROBERT DYE, ESCAMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, NICHOLAS GEEKER, JENNIE M KINSEY, LUMON MAY, CHARLES V PEPPLER, ALLISON PERDUE ROGERS, DOUG UNDERHILL, CHRISTOPHER E VARNER, filed by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR. (No service copies). (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/30 3:20 PM
ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time (ECF Doc. 8 ) is GRANTED, to the extent that Plaintiffs have until January 16, 2021 to file an amended complaint, compliant with the Court's order at ECF Doc. 5 . The letters docketed as "responses" (ECF Docs. 9 , 10 ) shall remain in the electronic file, but the Court will not consider them or take any action on them. Plaintiffs are reminded that future filings will not be accepted and will be returned unless they comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Northern District of Floridas Local Rules. (AMENDED Complaint due by 1/16/2021) .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/30/2020. (mb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 12/29 12:34 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:8 MOTION TO CONTINUE. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jcw)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 12/29 2:35 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:10 Second Response re5 ORDER with Exhibits,9 Response re5 ORDER. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
10 10 respoth Response/Reply Tue 12/29 2:33 PM
Second RESPONSE re5 Order, by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR, LINDA F STANBERRY.. (mb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit to Second RESPONSE letter
9 9 respoth Response/Reply Tue 12/29 2:22 PM
RESPONSE re5 Order, by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR, LINDA F STANBERRY. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/29 12:33 PM
MOTION TO CONTINUE by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR, LINDA F STANBERRY. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 14, 2020
7 7 misc Docket Annotation Mon 12/14 11:03 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re5 Order, Resent to Plaintiff for a third time, per Plaintiff's phone call request on this date. Clerk has verified Order was mailed 11/30/20, again on 12/11/20, and again on 12/14/20. (wlm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2020
6 6 misc Docket Annotation Fri 12/11 1:27 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT Re5 Order. Related [+]. (mb)
Related: [-] sent to Plaintiff, per plaintiff's phone call request
Monday, November 30, 2020
5 5 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/30 1:57 PM
ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiffs one (1) § 1983 complaint form for use by pro se, non-prisoner litigants. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended complaint stating a cause of action against the named Defendants. (Amended Complaint due by 12/30/2020 .) (Form mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/30/2020. (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 11/13 12:11 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:2 NOTICE of Exhibits, Exhibit 2 of 4, by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR, LINDA F STANBERRY re 1 Complaint..1 Complaint. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 11/02 4:02 PM
ORDER. I hereby disqualify myself from handling any proceedings in the above-styled case. The clerk is directed to randomly reassign this case to one of the active United States Magistrate Judges in this district and to change the docket to reflect the reassignment. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 11/2/2020. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
3 3 notice Notice to Pro Se Thu 10/29 8:17 AM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant, EARNEST STANBERRY JR AND LINDA F STANBERRY. (mb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 10/28 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Exhibits, Exhibit 2 of 4, by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR, LINDA F STANBERRY re1 Complaint.. (mb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 3 of 4,
Att: 2 Exhibit 4 of 4
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/28 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against MICHAEL ALLEN, STEVEN BARRY, ROBERT BENDER, JEFF BERGOSH, THOMAS DANNHEISER, ROBERT DYE, ESCAMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, NICHOLAS GEEKER, JENNIE M KINSEY, LUMON MAY, CHARLES V PEPPLER, ALLISON PERDUE ROGERS, DOUG UNDERHILL, CHRISTOPHER E VARNER (Filing fee $400, Receipt No. FLN314131), filed by EARNEST STANBERRY, JR, LINDA F STANBERRY. (mb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit