New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:20-cv-09004
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2020
Terminated:Nov 18, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Apr 25, 2021 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Maria I. Wager
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
John Does#1-3 In their official capacity
Defendant
John Does # 1-3 In their individual capacity
Defendant
Sergeant Stewart In his official capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Detective Puff In his official capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Detective Patrick King In his official capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Detective Camilo Antonini In his official capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sergeant Stewart In his individual capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Detective Puff In his individual capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Detective Patrick King In his individual capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Detective Camilo Antonini In his individual capacity
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Westchester County District Attorney's Office
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
John C. Thomas
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
District Attorney Anthony A. Scarpino, Jr.
148 Martine Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Police Officer Brown
Represented By
Steven Joseph Bushnell
The Quinn Law Firm
contact info
Matthew Kelly Schieffer
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Anthony J. DiFiore
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Marcarchuk
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth J. Knowlton
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Catalina Blanco Buitrago
Assistant District Attorney 148 Martine Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
County Of Westchester
148 Martine Avenue
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Sean Timothy Carey
Westchester County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
City of Mount Vernon
1 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Steven Joseph Bushnell
The Quinn Law Firm
contact info
Matthew Kelly Schieffer
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Anthony J. DiFiore
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gordon Tarrant
Represented By
Lauren Patricia Raysor
Law Office Of Lauren P. Raysor, Esq.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Detective Puff
Terminated: 01/13/2021
in his individual capacity 2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Defendant
Detective Camilo Antonini
Terminated: 01/13/2021
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Steven Joseph Bushnell
The Quinn Law Firm
contact info
Matthew Kelly Schieffer
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Anthony J. DiFiore
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
John Does #1-2
Terminated: 01/13/2021
Represented By
Steven Joseph Bushnell
The Quinn Law Firm
contact info
Matthew Kelly Schieffer
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Anthony J. DiFiore
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Sergeant Stewart
Terminated: 01/13/2021
2 Roosevelt Square
Mount Vernon, NY 10550
Represented By
Steven Joseph Bushnell
The Quinn Law Firm
contact info
Matthew Kelly Schieffer
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Andrew C Quinn
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Anthony J. DiFiore
The Quinn Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, November 18, 2022
111 111 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 11/18 10:14 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:110 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of City of Mount Vernon, Police Officer Brown, Detective Camilo Antonini In his individual capacity, Detective Camilo Antonini In his official capacity, Detective Patrick King In his individual capacity, Detective Patrick King In his official capacity, Detective Puff In his individual capacity, Detective Puff In his official capacity, John Does#1-3 In their official capacity, Sergeant Stewart In his individual capacity, Sergeant Stewart In his official capacity against Gordon Tarrant. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated November 17, 2022, the City Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 11/18/2022) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Right to Appeal
Thursday, November 17, 2022
110 110 11 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 11/17 5:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re:92 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Detective Patrick King In his individual capacity, Detective Puff In his official capacity, Detective Puff In his individual capacity, Sergeant Stewart In his official capacity, Detective Patrick King In his official capacity, Detective Camilo Antonini In his official capacity, City of Mount Vernon, Camilo Antonini, Detective Camilo Antonini In his individual capacity, Police Officer Brown, Sergeant Stewart In his individual capacity. For the foregoing reasons, the City Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion sequence pending at Doc. 92 and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/17/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]