California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:20-cv-07546
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2020
Terminated:Aug 23, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 25, 2021 3:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Dreamland Baby Co.
Represented By
Brian N Platt
Workman Nydegger
contact info
Margaret Elizabeth Day
Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli
contact info
Marc Christopher Belloli
Feinberg Day Kramer Alberti Lim Tonkovich & Belloli
contact info
Plaintiff
Nested Bean, Inc.
131 Coolidge Street Suite 102
Hudson, MA 01749
Represented By
Megan Rae Whyman Olesek
Turner Boyd LLP
contact info
Eric Carnevale
Lando And Anastasi
contact info
Craig R. Smith
Lando & Anastasi LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
47 47 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/05 9:48 AM
ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. 46, the conditional dismissal, Dkt. No. 45, is extended to November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
46 46 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/04 12:27 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re45 Order, Terminate Motions Joint Stipulation to Continue to Stay Litigation filed by Nested Bean, Inc..(Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 23, 2021
45 45 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 08/23 3:58 PM
ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/23/2021. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 19, 2021
44 44 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 08/19 11:34 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Litigation Pending Settlement filed by Dreamland Baby Co..(Day, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 19, 2021
43 43 order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 07/19 3:17 PM
Order. Defendant's request for construction of an additional 7 claims, Dkt. No. 38 , is denied. Construction is limited to 10 claims. Entered by Judge James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
42 42 misc Claim Construction Statement Tue 07/13 9:11 PM
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Nested Bean, Inc.. (Carnevale, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
41 41 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 07/06 1:16 PM
Declaration of Eric P. Carnevale in Support of40 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Eric Carnevale In Support of Nested Bean's Opposition to Dreamland's Administrative Motion filed byNested Bean, Inc.. Related [+] (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-] 40
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
40 40 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 07/06 1:04 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Nested Bean's Opposition to Dreamland's Motion For Administrative Relief filed byNested Bean, Inc.. (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-] 38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Allow Construction of Additional Claim Terms
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
39 39 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 06/29 8:00 PM
Declaration of Brian N. Platt in Support of38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Allow Construction of Additional Claim Terms filed byDreamland Baby Co.. Related [+] (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-] 38
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Dreamland Baby Co.'s Patent LR 4-1 Disclosure of Terms for Construction,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Dreamland Baby Co.'s Supplemental Preliminary Invalidity Contentions,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Defendant Dreamland Baby Co.'s Preliminary Claim Constructions,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Nested Bean's Patent LR 4-2 Disclosure of Preliminary Claim Constructions
38 38 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 06/29 7:57 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Allow Construction of Additional Claim Terms filed by Dreamland Baby Co.. Responses due by 7/6/2021. (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
37 37 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 03/05 1:26 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Rule 26(f) Joint Statement . (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
36 36 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/23 3:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDreamland Baby Co.. (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
35 35 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 02/09 4:45 PM
ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 29 , is suitable for decision without oral argument, Civil L.R. 7-1(b), and is denied. In the main, the motion is directed to arguing that plaintiff Nested Bean disclaimed "quilted-weighted" garments during patent prosecution, and so its infringement claim must fail. Dkt. No. 29 at 1. This portion of the motion relies heavily on prosecution history documents outside the complaint, and raises disputes about claim construction that are "not suitable for resolution on a motion to dismiss." Nalco Co. v. Chem-Mod, LLC , 883 F.3d 1337, 1349 (Fed. Cir. 2018). Even assuming that a heightened pleading standard applies, Nested Bean has also pleaded its two unfair competition claims with sufficient particularity under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 9(b). See, e.g. , Harris v. R.J. Reynolds Vapor Co. , No. 15-CV-04075-JD, 2017 WL 3617061, at *1 (N.D. Cal. Aug. 23, 2017). The motion hearing on February 11, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/9/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
34 34 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 01/27 9:53 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byDreamland Baby Co.. (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-] 29 MOTION to Dismiss
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
33 33 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 01/20 3:04 PM
Declaration of Eric P. Carnevale in Support of32 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Eric Carnevale In Support Of Nested Bean's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byNested Bean, Inc.. Related [+] (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-] 32
Att: 1 Exhibit A
32 32 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 01/20 3:00 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Nested Bean's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss filed byNested Bean, Inc..(Smith, Craig)
Related: [-] 29 MOTION to Dismiss
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
31 31 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Wed 01/06 8:16 AM
Request for Judicial Notice re30 Declaration in Support,29 MOTION to Dismiss filed byDreamland Baby Co.. Related [+] (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-] 30 ,29
30 30 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 01/06 8:15 AM
Declaration of Brian N. Platt in Support of29 MOTION to Dismiss filed byDreamland Baby Co.. Related [+] (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-] 29
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
29 29 motion Dismiss Wed 01/06 8:12 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dreamland Baby Co.. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/20/2021. Replies due by 1/27/2021.(Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
28 28 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 01/06 8:07 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Dreamland Baby Co. (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
27 27 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/05 12:30 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/05 11:42 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/04 11:31 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian N. Platt. (lrcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/28 1:50 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15371777.) filed by Dreamland Baby Co.. (Platt, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/02 9:51 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Eric P. Carnevale. (lrcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/01 11:14 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15258061.) filed by Nested Bean, Inc.. (Carnevale, Eric)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/01 10:17 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Craig R. Smith. (lrcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/30 10:09 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15251634.) filed by Nested Bean, Inc.. (Smith, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/25 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Christopher Belloli (Belloli, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2020
18 18 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/24 9:35 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk.(bwS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 11/24 8:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 11/24 7:54 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dreamland Baby Co... (Day, Margaret)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/24 7:52 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Dreamland Baby Co. (Day, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 10/27 7:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nested Bean, Inc. (Olesek, Megan Rae)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 10/27 6:56 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Nested Bean, Inc. (Olesek, Megan Rae)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report Tue 10/27 6:52 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Olesek, Megan Rae)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 10/27 6:47 PM
Proposed Summons. (Olesek, Megan Rae)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/27 6:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Dreamland Baby Co.. Filed byNested Bean, Inc..(Olesek, Megan Rae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet