New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:14-cv-03974
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2014
Terminated:Feb 17, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 20, 2015 12:46 AM EST
Defendant
The Eliv Group, LLC
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Meyers & Heim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Valente
Represented By
Robert Gerard Heim
Meyers & Heim LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Gerald A. Gross
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Barry Patrick O'Connell
U.S. Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Richard G Primoff
U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Andrew Matthew Calamari
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
68 68 misc Sealed Document Thu 03/03 4:28 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(wc)
Related: [-]
67 67 5 pgs order Order Thu 03/03 10:14 AM
ORDER ON CONSENT DIRECTING TRANSFER OF FUNDS FROM CRIS ACCOUNT AND MODIFYING PRIOR ASSET FREEZE ORDERS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer all funds currently held in the CRIS Account in this proceeding, from whatever source derived, by delivering a check representing the total sum currently on deposit, payable to the United States District Court, to the following address: United States District Court, Attn: Maria Devins, Financial Supervisor, P.O. Box 7367, 100 S. Clinton Street, Syracuse, N Y 13261-7367. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the Asset Freeze Orders are modified solely and to the extent necessary to allow for the satisfaction or enforcement by the United States or the United States Department of Justice of the restitution order entered in the Criminal Proceeding against any and all assets of Defendants, including but not limited to any assets held in the following accounts as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/2/2016) (rj)
Related: [-]
66 66 1 pgs order Endorsed Letter Thu 03/03 10:01 AM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Richard G Primoff dated 2/29/2016 re: I have submitted the proposed order, by email to wpclerk@nysd.uscourts.gov, in two versions. One unredacted and on redacted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 for ECF filing. Should the Court find the proposed order(s) acceptable, the Commission respectfully requests that a signed, unredacted version of the order be returned to my attention, either by facsimile or email. ENDORSEMENT: Docket this letter. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/2/2016) (rj)
Related: [-]
65 65 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 03/02 5:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Signed, Unredacted Order on Consent Dated March 2, 2016 served on Defendants and Elaine Valente a/k/a Elaine M. Burrill on March 2, 2016. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Primoff, Richard)
Related: [-]