Original Case: 1:18-cv-05587

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:20-cv-03114
Typecivil / us
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2020
Terminated:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: Monday Dec 14, 2020 2:24 AM CST
Appellant
FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By
William J. McKenna Jr.
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Andrew McClain
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Jill L. Nicholson
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Appellee
KEVIN B. DUFF, as Receiver
Represented By
Michael Rachlis
RACHLIS, DUFF, ADLER & PEEL LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CITIBANK, N.A., as Trustee for the registered holders of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Securities Inc.Multi - Mortgage pass through certificate series 2018-SB14
Represented By
William J. McKenna Jr.
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Andrew McClain
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Jill L. Nicholson
FOLEY & LARDNER LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By
John Bowers
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info
Michael Andrew Conley
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info
Morgan Bradylyons
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info
Timothy J. Stockwell
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info
Benjamin J. Hanauer
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/14/2020 2:22 AM CST
Wednesday, October 28, 2020
1 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Citibank, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association by 11/03/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 11/12/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/07/2020 for Citibank, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association. [1] [7118217] 20-3114 (ZNS) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:23 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 99 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 2 pgs Notice to District Court