California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 5:20-cv-07638
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2020
Terminated:Jan 12, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 28, 2021 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Cyberlink.com Corp.
Represented By
Matthew Cook Bernstein
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cassiopeia IP LLC
Represented By
Andrew S Curfman
Sand, Sebolt And Wernow Co., Lpa
contact info
Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Insight, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 30, 2020
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Fri 10/30 8:47 AM
Proposed Summons. (Ritcheson, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report Fri 10/30 8:46 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/30 8:45 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Cassiopeia IP LLC . (Ritcheson, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 10/30 8:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cassiopeia IP LLC (Ritcheson, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/30 8:44 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Cyberlink.com Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15134686.). Filed byCassiopeia IP LLC.(Ritcheson, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B