Utah District Court
Judge:Dale A Kimball
Referred: Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 2:20-cv-00762
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:754 Receiver of Property in Different Districts
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2020
Terminated:Nov 08, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 28, 2021 2:34 AM MDT
Defendant
Andy Meredith
Represented By
David R. Williams
Pearson Butler PLLC
contact info
Russell S. Walker
Woodbury & Kesler PC
contact info
Defendant
Candis Meredith
Represented By
David R. Williams
Pearson Butler PLLC
contact info
Russell S. Walker
Woodbury & Kesler PC
contact info
Defendant
Old Home Love
Represented By
David R. Williams
Pearson Butler PLLC
contact info
Russell S. Walker
Woodbury & Kesler PC
contact info
Plaintiff
David K. Broadbent
as Court-appointed Receiver for Zurixx, LLC and related entities HOLLAND & HART (UT) 60 E SOUTH TEMPLE STE 2000
SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84111
Represented By
Michelle Quist
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Engels Tejeda
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Cory A. Talbot
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Doyle S. Byers
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Chelsea J. Davis
contact info

GPO Oct 25 2021
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Receiver's 26 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/22/2021. (eat)
GPO Nov 08 2021
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Staying and Administratively Closing this Case. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Default Judgment is denied without prejudice. Case may be reopened upon motion of the Plaintiff or Defendants after judgment has been issued in the FTC enforcement action (Case No. 2:19-cv-713-DAK-DAO). Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/8/2021. (eat)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
33 33 misc Mail Returned Wed 12/01 9:44 AM
Mail sent to Defendants Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, and Old Home Love at the address listed on the docket re Docket Entry32 returned as "Return to Sender/Unclaimed/Unable to Forward." No other addresses are available. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
32 32 30+ pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Memorandum Decision Order to Administratively Close Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 11/08 12:43 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Staying and Administratively Closing this Case. Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Default Judgment is denied without prejudice. Case may be reopened upon motion of the Plaintiff or Defendants after judgment has been issued in the FTC enforcement action (Case No. 2:19-cv-713-DAK-DAO). Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/8/2021. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
31 31 misc Request to Submit for Decision Mon 10/25 11:15 AM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision re29 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Old Home Love Corp., Candis Meredith and Andy Meredith and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff David K. Broadbent. (Quist, Michelle)
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Memorandum Decision Mon 10/25 8:30 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying Receiver's 26 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 10/22/2021. (eat)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
29 29 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/20 3:11 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant(s) Old Home Love Corp., Candis Meredith and Andy Meredith and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff David K. Broadbent. (Quist, Michelle)
Related: [-]
28 28 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 09/20 3:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re26 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Old Home Love Corp., Candis Meredith and Andy Meredith filed by Plaintiff David K. Broadbent. (Quist, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
27 27 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/31 9:27 AM
ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT - re 26 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Old Home Love Corp., Candis Meredith and Andy Meredith filed by David K. Broadbent. The supplemental briefing is due September 20, 2021. The order shall be sent to the defendants at the address and email addresses set forth in the Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, 23 , and to all other parties. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/30/21.(jrj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Mailing Certificate
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
26 26 motion Entry of Default Wed 06/30 9:04 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Old Home Love Corp., Candis Meredith and Andy Meredith filed by Plaintiff David K. Broadbent. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Quist, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 03, 2021
25 25 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Thu 06/03 12:50 PM
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorneys Russell S. Walker and David R. Williams withdrawn from case for Defendants Old Home Love, Candis Meredith and Andy Meredith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/3/2021. (eat)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
24 24 respm Response to Motion Fri 05/28 5:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re23 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel Receiver's Non-Opposition filed by Plaintiff David K. Broadbent. (Quist, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
23 23 motion Withdraw as Counsel Mon 05/24 2:41 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Defendants Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, Old Home Love. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Tue 03/30 9:05 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Chelsea J. Davis filed by Chelsea J. Davis on behalf of David K. Broadbent (Davis, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/03 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Quist on behalf of David K. Broadbent (Quist, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
20 20 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/21 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/10/2021. Expert Discovery due by 10/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2021. 3-Day Bench Trial is set for 6/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dale A. Kimball. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/21/2021. (eat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
19 19 misc Attorney Planning Meeting Wed 01/20 3:28 PM
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING.(Davis, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 11, 2021
18 18 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 01/11 2:14 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 2 Complaint, filed by Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, Old Home Love. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
17 17 order Order Thu 01/07 10:03 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with 4 Paragraph 2 of the Order to Propose Schedule within fourteen (14) days. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/7/2021. (eh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of ADR Wed 01/06 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF ADR e-mailed to Plaintiff David K. Broadbent, and to Defendants Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, and Old Home Love. (eat)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/06 3:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, Old Home Love.(Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/09 7:46 AM
ORDER granting 12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, and Old Home Love: Answer due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/9/2020. (eat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
13 13 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/08 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Williams on behalf of Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, Old Home Love (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/08 4:05 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re2 Complaint, filed by Defendants Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, Old Home Love. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Walker, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Text of Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/08 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Russell S. Walker on behalf of Andy Meredith, Candis Meredith, Old Home Love (Walker, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/16 2:19 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by David K. Broadbent as to Andy Meredith served on 11/15/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Byers, Doyle)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/16 2:17 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by David K. Broadbent as to Candis Meredith served on 11/15/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Byers, Doyle)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/16 2:15 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by David K. Broadbent as to Old Home Love served on 11/15/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Byers, Doyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 11/13 11:20 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Andy Meredith. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 11/13 11:20 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Candis Meredith. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Electronically Fri 11/13 11:19 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Old Home Love. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
4 4 4 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Wed 11/04 2:17 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 11/4/2020. (eat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
3 3 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 11/03 11:01 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/3/2020. (eat)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
2 2 16 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 10/30 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3779592) filed by David K. Broadbent. Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Byers, Doyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 62 pgs Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 2 54 pgs Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, etc.,
Att: 3 118 pgs Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs' Motion for Ex Parte TRO, etc.,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit 4 - Schedule of Transfers, etc.
1 1 1 pgs misc Remark - New Case Fri 10/30 2:57 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff David K. Broadbent is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rks)
Related: [-]