Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:20-cv-00384
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2020
Terminated:Nov 17, 2020
Last checked: Saturday May 01, 2021 4:41 AM EDT
Defendant
LifeStream Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
April D Taylor
Represented By
Benjamin C Ellis
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
4 4 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Tue 11/17 3:22 PM
Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. (mrm)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Transferring Case to Other District Tue 11/17 3:18 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/17/2020. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/03 9:32 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/02 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C Ellis on behalf of April D Taylor (Ellis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/02 1:33 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against LifeStream Services, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4387901.), filed by April D Taylor.(Ellis, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Employee Handbook,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons