Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Susan E Huntsman
Case #: 4:20-cv-00559
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2020
Terminated:Apr 04, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 01, 2021 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
J Mike Williams
Plaintiff
Logisys, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob Riley Parker
Hanson & Holmes LLP
contact info
Howard Berkson
Boston Avenue Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
61 61 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Tue 05/07 9:36 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by Logisys, Inc. (Parker, Jacob)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Attorney - Added/Terminated Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Tue 05/07 10:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Eric F Melgren ; terminating attorney Jacob Riley Parker ; granting61 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 61 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s)