Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Rya W Zobel
Case #: 1:20-cv-11985
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2020
Terminated:Aug 04, 2022
Defendant
Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
Plaintiff
Rashad S. Suliman

GPO Aug 03 2022
Judge Rya W. Zobel: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiff's Motion for Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision (Docket #20) is DENIED, and Defendant's Motion for Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision (Docket #24) is ALLOWED. (Warnock, Douglas)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, August 04, 2022
35 35 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 08/04 2:39 PM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
34 34 6 pgs order Memorandum & Order Thu 08/04 2:13 PM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiff's Motion for Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision (Docket #20 ) is DENIED, and Defendant's Motion for Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision (Docket #24 ) is ALLOWED. (Warnock, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 07/27 11:50 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2022 re24 MOTION for Order Affirming Decision of Commissioner filed by Andrew M. Saul,20 MOTION for Order Reversing Decision of Commissioner filed by Rashad S. Suliman. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cary, Knapp & Pere) (Urso, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/19 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Marie Knapp on behalf of Rashad S. Suliman (Knapp, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Order Thu 06/23 9:54 AM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting30 Motion for Order to attend by phone (Urso, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
30 30 motion Order Mon 06/20 10:39 AM
MOTION for Order to Grant Leave To Attend The July 21, 2022 Hearing By Telephone by Andrew M. Saul.(Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/16 11:49 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing set for 7/21/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 (In person only) before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
28 28 misc Letter/request - non-motion Fri 05/20 5:08 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Kristina Cary to Judge Zobel dated May 20, 2022 re: Update on Mr. Suliman's SSA Disability Benefits .(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/14 3:55 PM
REPLY to Response to24 MOTION for Order Affirming Decision of Commissioner ,20 MOTION for Order Reversing Decision of Commissioner / Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Affirm the Commissioner's Decision filed by Rashad S. Suliman. (Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
26 26 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/29 2:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion for Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision to December 14, 2021 by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
25 25 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 11/23 5:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION for Order Affirming Decision of Commissioner filed by Andrew M. Saul. (Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Order Affirming Decision of Commissioner Tue 11/23 5:32 PM
MOTION for Order Affirming Decision of Commissioner by Andrew M. Saul.(Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
22 22 motion Extension of Time Thu 10/14 5:03 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 24, 2021 to File Motion and Memorandum for Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision by Andrew M. Saul.(Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
21 21 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 09/13 5:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re20 MOTION for Order Reversing Decision of Commissioner filed by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Suliman Record Part 1,
Att: 2 Suliman Record Part 2
20 20 motion Order Reversing Decision of Commissioner Mon 09/13 5:19 PM
MOTION for Order Reversing Decision of Commissioner by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
19 19 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/06 1:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to September 13, 2021 to to File Motion for Order Reversing Commissioner's Decision by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 02, 2021
18 18 order Procedural Order re Social Security Action Mon 08/02 3:47 PM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases Mon 08/02 3:06 PM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
16 16 misc SSA Administrative Record Tue 04/27 12:58 PM
SSA Administrative Record of Social Security Proceedings by Andrew M. Saul.(Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit Adm. Process Docs,
Att: 3 Exhibit Adm. Process Docs,
Att: 4 Exhibit Adm. Process Docs,
Att: 5 Exhibit Payment Docs and Decisions,
Att: 6 Exhibit Jurisdictional Docs and Notices,
Att: 7 Exhibit Non-Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Exhibit Disability Related Development,
Att: 9 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 1,
Att: 10 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 2,
Att: 11 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 3,
Att: 12 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 4,
Att: 13 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 5,
Att: 14 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 6,
Att: 15 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 7,
Att: 16 Exhibit Medical Records - Part 8
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/27 12:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Andrew M. Saul.(Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/26 4:49 PM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint Andrew M. Saul answer due 4/29/2021. (Urso, Lisa)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/26 10:19 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to April 29, 2021 to File Answer and Electronic Administrative Record by Andrew M. Saul.(Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/26 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Pere on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Pere, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
11 11 misc Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court Thu 01/07 10:12 AM
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Rashad S. Suliman: USMS Process Receipt and Return - William Barr served, delivered by certified mail on 11/20/2020. Please note: William Barr is not a listed party on this case. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court Thu 01/07 10:11 AM
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Rashad S. Suliman: USMS Process Receipt and Return - Andrew Lelling served, Delivered 12/30/2020 - Please Note: Andrew Lelling is not a listed party on this case. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc USMS Process Receipt and Return Thu 01/07 10:05 AM
US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for Summons and Complaint. Andrew M. Saul served, Delivered on 1/4/2021. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 12/21 3:47 PM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Benjamin Lasky. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/17 3:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Benjamin Lasky Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8558442 by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Benjamin Lasky
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 11/04 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice - Other Wed 11/04 9:32 AM
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF (service by USMS) with copies of LR 4.1 and FRCP 4(i). Counsel may download USM-285 forms from the United States Marshals Website and may contact Clerk if hard copies of the USM-285 forms are needed.(PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/04 9:27 AM
Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons for service of the defendant. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint and this order upon defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Notwithstanding Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1, the plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service. (PSSA, 4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 11/03 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/03 4:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/03 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Rashad S. Suliman.(Cary, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Form