Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:20-cr-02297
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 04, 2020 12:31 AM MST
Defendant
Enrique Monarque-Orozco (1)
Represented By
Roberto C Montiel
Law Office Of Roberto C Montiel
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Margaret Amalia Moeser
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Mary Sue Feldmeier
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Wallace Heath Kleindienst
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
Elizabeth S Boison
Us Dept Of Justice - Money Laundering & Asset Recovery
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2020 12:50 AM MST
Friday, August 14, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco (1). (DLC) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth S Boison appearing for USA. (DLC) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary Sue Feldmeier appearing for USA. (DLC) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wallace H Kleindienst appearing for USA. (DLC) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
6 6 Application/Order/Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco for Initial Appearance set for 8/28/2020 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/14/2020.(DLC) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
7 7 First MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) by USA as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco.(Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting7 Motion for Protective Order as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/26/20. (See attached Order for complete details.)(MYE) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
Arrest of Enrique Monarque-Orozco on 8/28/2020. (BHA) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
9 9 *NOTICE of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant of Appearance by Enrique Monarque-Orozco. (Montiel, Roberto) *Modified to correct event type on 8/31/2020 (MYE). [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco held on 8/28/2020. Defendant has consulted with his attorney and consents to appearing via video-conference. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Defendant proceeded in English, however at the end of the hearing, per his attorney, he would prefer to go forward with the assistance of the Spanish language interpreter. SO ORDERED. Interpreter required for Enrique Monarque-Orozco (1) Spanish. Appearances : AUSA Heather Sechrist, duty for the Government. Based on the information provided to the Court by defense counsel, the Court finds Mr. Montiel cannot reasonably appear in person or via VTC. Therefore, retained attorney Roberto Montiel appearing telephonically for defendant.Defendant is present, consents to appearing via video-conference and is in custody. Detention Hearing set for 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. Related [+] Hearing held 2:20 pm to 3:40 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
12 12 WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING AND CONSENT TO DETENTION by Enrique Monarque-Orozco filed 9/2/2020. (Montiel, Roberto) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
13 13 Government's Notice of Automatic Extension of Speedy Trial Clock Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b)/(General Orders 20-12 and 20-20) as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco . (Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
14 14 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: 20-WI-764-RM(DTF). Proposed felony information submitted by AUSA as to defendant Monarque-Orozco. (NEC) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: MARGARET A MOESER appearing for USA . (Moeser, Margaret) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
17 17 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 9/2/2020.(SIB) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
18 18 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING set for November 2, 2020 at 11:00am by Enrique Monarque-Orozco. (Montiel, Roberto) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
19 19 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED the Change of Plea, as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco, is set for 11/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3C, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Pursuant to General Order 20-26, defendant will be appearing by way of video conferencing. Counsel to be present in the courtroom, however, if counsel request telephonic appearance, counsel should send an email to: ferraro_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel should refer to the District Court website for the Tucson Procedure for Providing Paperwork for Change of Plea hearings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro.(DTF, sm)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
20 20 LODGED Proposed Information by USA as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted.. (Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
21 21 LODGED Proposed signed Waiver of Indictment by USA as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted.. (Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
22 22 LODGED Proposed signed plea agreement by USA as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted.. (Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
23 23 LODGED Proposed signed Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge by USA as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted.. (Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
24 24 LODGED Proposed Preliminary Order of Forfeiture by USA as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted.. (Feldmeier, Mary Sue) [4:20-mj-08854-N/A-DTF]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
25 25 Pursuant to Section 15002(b)(2) of the CARES Act, prior to conducting any felony change of plea or sentencing hearing by video-teleconference, "the district judge in a particular case" must find for "specific reasons that the plea or sentencing cannot be further delayed without serious harm to the interests of justice." Due to public health concerns arising from the COVID-19 pandemic, the federal courthouses in this district have been largely closed for a number of months. Proceedings in criminal cases have been held by video and telephone conferencing as permitted by the CARES Act, but few, if any, criminal jury trials have been held and many other criminal proceedings have been postponed. As a result, the Court is facing a serious backlog of criminal trials and proceedings that must be resolved in the coming months, and the Court will face even more criminal cases once grand jury proceedings resume and many new indictments are filed. For these reasons, the Court finds that proceedings in this case should begin now, and that further delay would seriously harm the interests of justice by contributing to the growing backlog of criminal matters caused by the pandemic. Additionally, the Court finds that speedy trial concerns warrant proceeding with the plea in this case, and that further delay would seriously harm the interests of justice in a speedy resolution of this matter. For the above reasons, the Court finds that the interests of justice require that this matter proceed immediately and by VTC or, if necessary, telephonic means. Counsel are authorized to proceed with a change of plea proceeding and sentencing. Ordered by Judge Rosemary Marquez.(SIB)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
26 26 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Enrique Monarque-Orozco. (SIB)
Related: [-]
27 27 INFORMATION - Felony as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco (1) count(s) 1. (SIB)
Related: [-]
29 29 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Enrique Monarque-Orozco. (SIB)
Related: [-]
30 30 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Arraignment/Change of Plea as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco held on 11/2/2020. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Defendant consents to appear by video teleconference and gives defense counsel permission to sign documents on his behalf. Based on the information provided to the Court, the Court finds that counsel cannot reasonably appear in person or via VTC and appears telephonically. Defendant enters a plea of guilty as to Count 1 of the Information. Plea agreement filed. THE COURT ORDERS the trial date/pending hearings VACATED. Pending motions are rendered moot. Prior custody/release orders are AFFIRMED. The Court directs the US Probation Office to prepare a Presentence Report. Forfeiture Order signed. Appearances : AUSA Mary Sue Feldmeier and Elizabeth Boison (telephonically) for the Government, retained attorney Roberto Montiel telephonically for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Leilanie Solis assists defendant. Sentencing set for 1/28/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Rosemary Marquez. Related [+] Hearing held 11:00 AM to 11:28 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
31 31 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. (SIB)
Related: [-]
32 32 MAGISTRATE JUDGE FINDINGS & RECOMMENDATION UPON A PLEA OF GUILTY as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/2/2020.(SIB)
Related: [-]
33 33 PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Enrique Monarque-Orozco. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/2/2020.(SIB)
Related: [-]