Greco et al v. CITY OF NEW YORK et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis J Liman |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-09265 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 04, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday May 03, 2021 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dermot Shea
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City Of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Greco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Second Amendment Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Insalaco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ricatto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John J Winters
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
47 | 47
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal ~Util - Case Stay Lifted
Mon 10/24 11:09 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is withdrawn and the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with prejudice as to the specific Rules of the City of New York provisions challenged in the Complaint, with both parties to bear their own fees and costs. It is SO ORDERED this 24 day of October, 2022. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to lift the stay and close this case. Case Stay Lifted. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/24/2022) (va) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2022 | ||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/21 9:25 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 46 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Stayed case. (nd) |
||
Thursday, October 20, 2022 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 10/20 1:21 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) City Of New York, Dermot Shea and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 10/20 9:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Aimee Lulich. RE-FILE Document No. 45 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the individual party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were not selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct individual filer/filers - select the correct individual party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/19 1:09 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/19 9:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Aimee Lulich. RE-FILE Document No. 44 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 1. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the voluntary dismissal does not state pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); 2. the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected; 3. the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd) |
||
Tuesday, October 18, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/18 1:19 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 10/17 10:33 AM
ORDER: On August 26, 2022, counsel for Defendants wrote to inform the Court that the matter has been resolved and the parties expect to file a stipulation of discontinuance to that effect the following week. Almost two months have passed and no such stipulation has been filed. Defendants have also failed to file an opposition to Plaintiffs' pending motion for a preliminary injunction by the deadline set by the Court and Plaintiffs have not filed a reply. Dkt. No. 41. The parties are ORDERED to file by October 21, 2022 a stipulation of discontinuance or show cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/17/2022) (vfr) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2022 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Letter
Fri 08/26 12:12 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Aimee Lulich dated August 26, 2022 Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/08 5:29 PM
ORDER: As stated at the scheduling conference on July 6, 2022, defendants may file an opposition to the pending motion for a preliminary injunction by August 26, 2022. Plaintiffs may file a reply by September 16, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 8/26/2022, Replies due by 9/16/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/8/2022) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 07/07 1:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Scheduling Conference held on 7/6/2022. David Jensen present for Plaintiffs. Aimee Lulich and Thomas Rizzuti present for Defendants. (mf) |
||
Thursday, June 30, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 07/01 10:22 AM
ORDER: The Court will hold a scheduling conference regarding the motion for a preliminary injunction, Dkt. No. 33, on July 6, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15C at the 500 Pearl Street Courthouse. SO ORDERED. ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2022 at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/30/2022) (va) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 06/29 12:31 PM
DECLARATION of John J. Winters in Support re:33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits . MOTION for Permanent Injunction .. Document filed by John J Winters..(Jensen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 06/29 12:29 PM
DECLARATION of Michael Ricatto in Support re:33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits . MOTION for Permanent Injunction .. Document filed by Michael Ricatto..(Jensen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 06/29 12:28 PM
DECLARATION of Jeffrey Ortiz in Support re:33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits . MOTION for Permanent Injunction .. Document filed by Jeffrey Ortiz..(Jensen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 06/29 12:27 PM
DECLARATION of Steven Insalaco in Support re:33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits . MOTION for Permanent Injunction .. Document filed by Steven Insalaco..(Jensen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Wed 06/29 12:25 PM
DECLARATION of George Greco in Support re:33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits . MOTION for Permanent Injunction .. Document filed by George Greco..(Jensen, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
34 | 34
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Wed 06/29 12:23 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits . MOTION for Permanent Injunction . . Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Steven Insalaco, Jeffrey Ortiz, Michael Ricatto, Second Amendment Foundation, John J Winters..(Jensen, David) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Preliminary Injunction Permanent Injunction
Wed 06/29 12:22 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to advance and consolidate trial on the merits ., MOTION for Permanent Injunction . Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Steven Insalaco, Jeffrey Ortiz, Michael Ricatto, Second Amendment Foundation, John J Winters..(Jensen, David) |
|
Monday, June 28, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 06/28 9:59 PM
ORDER granting29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery deadlines are extended by 30 days as proposed. Fact Discovery is extended to July 26, 2021. Expert Discovery is extended to September 8, 2021. The Post-Discovery Status Conference is rescheduled to September 24, 2021 at 2:00PM. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 06/28 10:02 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: (Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2021. Expert Discovery due by 9/8/2021.) Set/Reset Hearings: (Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (mf) |
||
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 06/24 11:28 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Aimee Lulich dated June 24, 2021. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Thursday, June 03, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
order
Protective Order
Thu 06/03 11:55 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/3/2021) (rro) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Proposed Protective Order
Wed 06/02 2:26 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/17 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas John Rizzuti on behalf of City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Rizzuti, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/24 6:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed no later than 3/26/2021. Fact Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Depositions shall be completed by 6/10/2021. Expert Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Deposition due by 8/9/2021. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. The proposed joint pretrial order shall be submitted on ECF in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3) no later than 30 days before scheduled trial date. Status Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. Motions due by 8/23/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is to be determined. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/24/2021) (va) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 02/24 4:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/2021 by Telephone Conference. David Jensen present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Aimee Lulich present by telephone for Defendants. Case management plan approved. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for August 13, 2021 at 11:00AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf) |
||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 02/19 11:39 AM
ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Case Management Plan
Wed 02/17 7:06 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 01/08 4:29 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Initial Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to February 24, 2021 at 11:00AM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. Parties are to jointly submit a proposed case management plan and scheduling order, according to the Courts Individual Practices in Civil Cases, by one week prior to the Initial Conference. ( Initial Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mf) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 01/07 4:04 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for January 13, 2021 addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Aimee Lulich dated January 7, 2021., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Aimee Lulich dated January 7, 2021. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/05 11:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against City Of New York, Dermot Shea.Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, George Greco, Jeffrey Ortiz, Michael Ricatto, Steven Insalaco, John J Winters. Related document:1 Complaint..(Jensen, David) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 12/30 6:55 AM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 12/29 12:39 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Aimee Lulich dated December 29, 2020. Document filed by City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/29 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aimee Kara Lulich on behalf of City Of New York, Dermot Shea..(Lulich, Aimee) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 12/22 12:09 PM
ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference previously set for December 23, 2020 is RESCHEDULED to January 13, 2021 at 11:00AM. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 12/22 12:11 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf) |
||
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 12/18 3:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Dermot Shea served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Service was accepted by Police Officer McGrath. Document filed by George Greco; Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.; Second Amendment Foundation..(Jensen, David) |
|
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Fri 12/18 3:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City Of New York served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. Service was accepted by Lemar Reid for NYC Corporation Counsel. Document filed by George Greco; Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.; Second Amendment Foundation..(Jensen, David) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/14 2:53 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dermot Shea..(dnh) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Mon 12/14 2:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York..(dnh) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/11 3:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dermot Shea, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Second Amendment Foundation..(Jensen, David) |
|
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/11 3:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Second Amendment Foundation..(Jensen, David) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Deleted Document
Fri 12/11 3:11 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York. The document PDF contained a typographical error. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 12/11 3:12 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Douglas Jensen to RE-FILE Document No. 8 Request for Issuance of Summons, 9 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the Civil Action No. listed on the summons PDF contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) |
||
Thursday, December 10, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 12/10 1:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dermot Shea, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Second Amendment Foundation..(Jensen, David) |
|
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 12/10 1:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Second Amendment Foundation..(Jensen, David) |
|
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Thu 12/10 10:25 AM
Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-22442807, paid on 11/04/2020..(dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 12/10 10:29 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Douglas Jensen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 12/10 10:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Douglas Jensen to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): due to party modification the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons (Second Amendment Foundation, Inc). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) |
||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 12/09 8:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dermot Shea, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc...(Jensen, David) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 12/09 8:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., George Greco, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc...(Jensen, David) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Thu 12/03 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on December 23, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 12/23/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 12/3/2020) (va) |
|
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 11/05 9:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Douglas Jensen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CITY OF NEW YORK, Dermot Shea.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 11/05 9:08 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 11/05 9:08 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 11/05 9:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/04 11:07 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc...(Jensen, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/04 11:06 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc...(Jensen, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/04 11:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jensen, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/04 9:55 PM
COMPLAINT against CITY OF NEW YORK, Dermot Shea. Document filed by George Greco, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, Inc...(Jensen, David) |